Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 5/20/2022 5:54:08 AM
Friday, February 4, 2022
Senate
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/5/2022 3:58 PM
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
10:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/5/2022 3:58 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/5/2022 3:58 PM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 2/2/2022 3:02 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
9:30 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Created: 2/2/2022 12:13 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Hill

Declaration of Rights - Religious Freedom, Religious Tests, and Oaths and Affirmations
Del Cullison

State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Membership and Official Seal
Del Bagnall

Mental Health Law – Petitions for Emergency Evaluation – Electronic Record
Del Cullison

Health Insurance - Nonprofit Health Service Plan - Board of Directors
Del Qi

Insurance – Annuities – Nonforfeiture – Interest Rate
Del Sample-Hughes

State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Revisions
Del Carr

Public Information Act - Required Denials - Sociological Information and Distribution Lists
Del Bagnall

Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial
Del Bagnall

Interstate Medical Licensure Compact – Sunset Extension and Reporting
Del Harrison

State Government – Legal and Employee Holiday – Juneteenth National Independence Day
Dels Carr and Lehman

Open Meetings Act – Notices, Closed Sessions, and Minutes – Retention Periods, Online Posting, and Public Inspection
Del Carr

State Board of Physicians - Dispensing Permits
(Removed - 2/2/2022 6:47 PM)

Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 1/28/2022 10:35 AM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Guest-Anne Arundel Board of Education
Vote HB95
Legislative Bond Initiatives

Baltimore City
Created: 2/3/2022 5:18 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Baltimore City Delegation meeting can be streamed on Facebook
This meeting will be for the Baltimore City Delegation hearings. This will be a recurring meeting every Friday at 9 am

Baltimore County
Created: 1/31/2022 4:39 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefings:
Dr. Gregory Wm. Branch-Baltimore County Health and Human Services
Senator Ben Cardin
Bill Hearings: HB309, HB446, HB460
Voting: HB265

Eastern Shore
Created: 12/29/2021 2:13 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Information and questions and answers from various organizations for members of the Eastern Shore Delegation and their constituents.

Frederick
Created: 1/31/2022 2:17 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Members of the general public are invited to speak during the public comment portion of the meeting. Please request a Zoom link by 9:00 am on Wednesday at ken.kerr@house.state.md.us
You must specify the bill or bills you want to speak to or indicate that you want to make general public comment.
You will be given a participants' zoom link and admitted into the meeting when we reach that portion of the agenda. You will be invited to speak to the Delegation members for 2 minutes
The Delegation will be voting on bills requested by the Frederick County Liquor Board and considering Frederick County's Transportation Priorities for 2022. A complete agenda will be forthcoming.

Montgomery
Created: 2/1/2022 11:56 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Created: 2/2/2022 11:28 AM
Bill Hearing
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Meeting Video
The Meeting will be livestreamed from the Baltimore City Delegation Facebook Page
To submit written testimony or sign up for oral testimony contact: baltcitysendelegation@mlis.state.md.us
Sen Ferguson

Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - Licensee Hours of Operation
Sen McCray

Baltimore City Public School Buildings - Notice of Demolition - Repeal
Sen Hayes

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Transfer

Southern Maryland
Created: 1/31/2022 4:35 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Southern Maryland Delegation Meeting

Click to return on the top page