Day(s)
As of: 5/13/2025 9:11:13 AM
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 2/4/2021 4:30 PM
1:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Reilly
Wetlands and Waterways - Riparian Rights - Prohibition on Termination or Impairment
Sen Augustine
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sen Elfreth, et al
Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
Sen Bailey
St. Mary's County - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors
Sens Patterson and Benson
Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sen Kagan
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
(Added - 2/5/2021 11:43 AM)
Chr EHE (Dept)
State Government – Protection of Information – Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Created: 1/31/2021 8:18 AM
11:00 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Augustine
Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
(Added - 2/3/2021 6:15 PM)
(Added - 2/3/2021 6:15 PM)
(Added - 2/3/2021 6:15 PM)
(Added - 2/3/2021 6:15 PM)
(Added - 2/3/2021 6:15 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements
(Added - 2/3/2021 6:15 PM)
Created: 2/1/2021 4:24 PM
1:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/28/2021 12:20 PM
2:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/3/2021 6:03 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del D.E. Davis
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
(Jointly assigned to Economic Matters\Appropriations)
Created: 2/2/2021 3:50 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 2/3/2021 9:29 PM)
Del Stewart
Environment – Application of Coal Tar Pavement Products – Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2021)
(Added - 2/3/2021 9:29 PM)
(Added - 2/3/2021 9:29 PM)
(Added - 2/3/2021 9:29 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
(Added - 2/3/2021 9:29 PM)
Del Lehman, et al
Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension and Fee on Commercial Feed
(Added - 2/3/2021 9:29 PM)
Del Stewart
Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving, Speed Contests, Registration Plates, and Noise Abatement - Penalties
(Added - 2/3/2021 9:29 PM)
(Added - 2/3/2021 9:29 PM)
(Added - 2/3/2021 9:29 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
(Added - 2/3/2021 9:29 PM)
(Added - 2/3/2021 9:29 PM)
(Added - 2/3/2021 9:29 PM)
(Added - 2/3/2021 9:29 PM)
Created: 2/3/2021 11:39 AM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Moon
Public Safety – Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund – Extension and Program Requirements
Created: 2/3/2021 8:43 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Some or all of these bills to be voted on.
Del Luedtke
Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation Expenses - Montgomery County Deer Donation Program
Del Wilkins
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Del Ebersole
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Del Rosenberg
Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Judiciary)
Del McKay
Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
Del Boyce
Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - Repeal of Repayment Requirement
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Education - School Site Council Pilot Program MC 21-21
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Appropriations) Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
Del Solomon
Early Childhood Education - Child Care Provider Support Grant Program (The Child Care Provider Support Act)
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Appropriations)
Del Boyce
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Bronchodilator Availability and Use - Policy (Bronchodilator Rescue Inhaler Law)
St. Mary's County Delegation
St. Mary’s County – Public and Nonpublic Schools – Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Economic Matters) Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George’s County – Elementary School Students – Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act) PG 504–21
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Board of Education and Chief Executive Officer - Revisions PG 502-21
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
(Removed - 1/26/2021 10:03 AM)
(Removed - 1/26/2021 12:13 PM)
(Removed - 1/28/2021 10:14 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George’s County – Board of Education and Chief Executive Officer – Alterations PG 503–21
(Removed - 2/2/2021 8:10 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County Board of Education - Nonstudent Member Compensation and Student Member Scholarship PG 501-21
(Removed - 2/3/2021 3:36 PM)
Special Guest: Senator Chris Van Hollen
Local Bill Hearings and Voting Session
Briefing: Department of Legislative Services Aid to Baltimore County Report.
Bill Hearings: HB85, HB559, HB573, HB751
Voting: HB249, HB253, HB348
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.
Presentations from Federal Representatives
(Added - 1/29/2021 2:23 PM)
Created: 1/27/2021 2:23 PM
11:00 AM - Webex-Teleconference
Conference Call-In Number: (US) 1-661-486-1370
PIN: 873 142 234#
PIN: 873 142 234#
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority Meeting
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools