Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/27/2024 1:08:25 AM
Monday, February 12, 2024
House
Capital Budget Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Canceled
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Briefing
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Capital Fiscal Briefing by Department of Legislative Services

Created: 1/4/2024 3:33 PM
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority
(Removed - 1/17/2024 4:37 PM)
Department of Commerce
(Removed - 2/9/2024 4:13 PM)
Maryland Stadium Authority
(Removed - 2/9/2024 4:13 PM)

Click to return on the top page