Day(s)
As of: 9/26/2024 6:06:47 PM
Created: 2/12/2021 4:58 PM
11:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
District Court, Anne Arundel County (District 7)
Kemp W. Hammond, Esq., Anne Arundel County, District 30
District Court, Baltimore County (District 8)
Marsha L. Russell, Baltimore County, District 7
Leo Ryan, Jr., Baltimore County, District 11
District Court, Howard County (District 10)
Ricardo D. Zwaig, Howard County, District 9
District Court, Prince George's County (District 5)
Bryon S. Bereano, Prince George's County, District 22
Community Health Resources Commission, Maryland
Karen-Ann Lichtenstein, Anne Arundel County, District 30
Handgun Roster Board
Charles T. Robinson, Sr., Howard County, District 13
Carl W. Roy, II, Calvert County, District 27
Physicians, State Board of
Carol Ehlinger Ritter, M.D., Baltimore City, District 43
Ifeyinwa A. Stitt, M.D., Howard County, District 13
Public Information Act Compliance Board, State
Christopher A. Eddings, Baltimore County, District 11
Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors, State Commission of
Nathan J. Cavey, Jr., Howard County, District 9
Steven J. Feyerick, Montgomery County, District 15
Stacy A. Harman, Harford County, District 35
Thomas E. Owen, Anne Arundel County, District 31
Gwendolyn D. Skillern, CPA, Baltimore County, District 10
Rural Legacy Board, Advisory Committee to the
Mary E. Goodall, Baltimore County, District 42
Technology Development Corporation Board of Directors, Maryland
Michael J. Howard, Prince George's County, District 26
Created: 2/11/2021 1:31 PM
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appearing
5:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Appalachian States Low-Level Radioactive Waste Commission
Clifford Seth Mitchell, M.D., Baltimore City, District 46
Albert J. Romanosky, M.D., Ph.D., Anne Arundel County, District 31
Certified Interior Designers, State Board of
Carmen Parsons-Sneed, Montgomery County, District 20
Foresters, State Board of
Brian F. Knox, Queen Anne's County, District 36
Handgun Roster Board
Ira M. Click, Frederick County, District 3
P. Michael Errico, Anne Arundel County, District 33
Jonathan Wesley Maurath, Anne Arundel County, District 33
Russell N. Shea, Jr., Baltimore City, District 46
Michael A. Spaulding, Anne Arundel County, District 33
Nicholas B. Wilson, Baltimore City, District 40
Heritage Areas Authority, Maryland
John A. Kinnaird, Frederick County, District 4
Indian Affairs, Commission on
Sherry L. Ayers, Baltimore City, District 41
Peter Cabel Brooks, Baltimore City, District 41
Tiara R. Thomas, Charles County, District 28
Guy G. Wells, Caroline County, District 36
Landscape Architects, Board of Examiners of
Cameron C. Duncan, Montgomery County, District 16
Marine Contractors Licensing Board
Robert C. Murtha, Jr., Queen Anne's County, District 36
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Board of Directors
Violet M. Apple, Baltimore County, District 11
Sidney Allen Butcher, Anne Arundel County, District 32
Philip N. Nichols, Jr., Prince George's County, District 21
Debra A. Thomas, Esq., Baltimore City, District 43
Patuxent Institution Board of Review
Randall S. Nero, Ph.D., Anne Arundel County, District 31
Pharmacy, State Board of
Brenda L. Oliver, Howard County, District 9
Plumbing, State Board of
Joseph A. Radtka, Anne Arundel County, District 33
Professional Land Surveyors, State Board for
Derrick W. McLaughlin, Baltimore County, District 11
Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board
Darren R. Hornbeck, Howard County, District 12
Christopher W. Lloyd, Frederick County, District 4
Kelli A. Midgley, Howard County, District 12
Racing Commission, State
Emmet Davitt, Esq., Baltimore County, District 12
Konrad M. Wayson, Anne Arundel County, District 30
Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors, State Commission of
Anatol L. Polillo, Baltimore City, District 43
Robert S. Troxell, Prince George's County, District 22
Residential Boarding Education Programs, Board of Trustees of
R. Christopher Rosenthal, Anne Arundel County, District 30
G. William Whiting, Baltimore County, District 11
Rural Legacy Board, Advisory Committee to the
Jeff R. Degitz, Carroll County, District 5
Frank E. Dudek, Baltimore County, District 7
Technology Development Corporation Board of Directors, Maryland
Jennifer H. Elisseeff, Ph.D., Baltimore City, District 43
Robert K. Lord, Baltimore City, District 46
Myra W. Norton, Anne Arundel County, District 33
Created: 2/14/2021 8:40 AM
6:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/12/2021 4:45 PM
4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
Del Love
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
Del Stewart
Health and Welfare of H–2 Visa and Migrant Workers – COVID–19 Pandemic – Regulations (Healthy Farmworkers Act)
Del Valderrama
Professional Land Surveyors - Surveying Practice - Definition and Licensing Exception
Created: 2/11/2021 10:22 AM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/12/2021 2:10 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/12/2021 2:49 PM
3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/12/2021 11:27 AM
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Rosenberg
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Ways and Means)
Del Sample-Hughes
Maryland Department of Health – Residential Service Agencies – Training Requirements
Del Bhandari
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy
Del Pena-Melnyk
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Committee - Reporting and Sunset Extension
Del Cullison
Health Care Facilities - Dialysis Treatment Services - Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)
Created: 1/31/2021 9:37 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Bills are ordered as they appear below. All sponsors will receive three (3) minutes each for oral testimony and all witnesses will receive two (2) minutes each for oral testimony.
Del Atterbeary
State Government – Attorney General – Independent Law Enforcement Prosecution Unit
(Added - 2/5/2021 1:15 PM)
(Added - 2/5/2021 1:15 PM)
Del Haynes
Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - Reports
Del Buckel
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Identification Tags and Badges - Name Requirement
(Added - 2/5/2021 1:15 PM)
(Added - 2/2/2021 12:43 PM)
(Added - 2/2/2021 12:43 PM)
(Added - 2/5/2021 1:15 PM)
(Added - 2/5/2021 1:15 PM)
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders