Day(s)
As of: 9/26/2024 6:06:24 PM
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM
-
Virtual Meeting
2:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 2/18/2021 4:16 PM
Thursday, February 18, 2021
1:30 PM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
1:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Pinsky
Power Plant Research Program - Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Alterations
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Created: 2/18/2021 6:31 PM
10:30 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 2/19/2021 12:09 PM
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 2/19/2021 6:37 PM
6:45 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 2/17/2021 5:45 PM
Thursday, February 18, 2021
11:00 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Luedtke
Influence on Collective Bargaining – Prohibition on Use of Public Funds and Income Tax Addition Modification
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Ways and Means)
Del Lierman
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Del Ivey
University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, and St. Mary's College of Maryland - Board Membership - Alterations
Del Charkoudian
Human Services – Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program – Heat and Eat Program
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/18/2021 2:53 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 2/5/2021 2:56 PM)
Del Qi
Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021)
(Added - 2/5/2021 2:56 PM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 3:46 PM)
Created: 1/18/2021 2:53 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Arentz
Queen Anne’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees MC 19-21
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Seating Requirements MC 11–21
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Draft Beer for Off-Site Consumption in Damascus MC 12-21
Del T. Branch
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Districts - Legislative Districting Plan References
St. Mary's County Delegation
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Distillery On-Site Consumption Permit
(Added - 1/20/2021 3:31 PM)
(Added - 1/20/2021 3:31 PM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Distance Restrictions PG 304-21
(Added - 1/22/2021 2:37 PM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcohol Density Zones and Licenses PG 307–21
(Added - 1/22/2021 2:37 PM)
(Added - 1/22/2021 2:37 PM)
(Added - 1/22/2021 2:37 PM)
Del Bhandari
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Qualifications
(Added - 1/28/2021 10:13 AM)
(Added - 1/29/2021 3:30 PM)
(Added - 1/29/2021 3:30 PM)
Wicomico County Delegation
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Food Sales Requirement for Class B (Golf Course) License
(Added - 1/29/2021 3:30 PM)
(Added - 1/29/2021 3:30 PM)
(Added - 1/29/2021 3:30 PM)
(Added - 1/29/2021 3:30 PM)
Allegany County Delegation
Allegany County – Alcoholic Beverages – Transfer and Auction of Licenses
(Added - 1/29/2021 3:30 PM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Sanctions and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 317-20
(Added - 2/5/2021 2:59 PM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - BLX License PG 318-21
(Added - 2/5/2021 2:59 PM)
(Added - 2/5/2021 2:59 PM)
(Added - 2/5/2021 2:59 PM)
Charles County Delegation
Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License
(Added - 2/5/2021 2:59 PM)
Al Co Deleg and Gar Co Deleg
Allegany and Garrett Counties - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permits
(Added - 2/5/2021 2:59 PM)
(Added - 2/5/2021 2:59 PM)
(Added - 2/5/2021 2:59 PM)
(Added - 2/5/2021 2:59 PM)
Howard County Delegation
Howard County – Class A Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Quota by Election District Ho. Co. 02 -21
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:07 PM)
Howard County Delegation
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption Ho. Co. 04-21
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:07 PM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:07 PM)
Howard County Delegation
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Ho. Co. 03-21
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:07 PM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:07 PM)
Frederick County Delegation
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Licenses - Off-Premises Consumption
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:07 PM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:07 PM)
Frederick County Delegation
Frederick County – Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine Licenses – Alterations
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:07 PM)
Frederick County Delegation
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol by Volume - Wine
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:07 PM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:07 PM)
(Removed - 1/21/2021 3:18 PM)
(Removed - 2/17/2021 9:56 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses for Supermarkets PG 306-21
(Removed - 2/17/2021 5:43 PM)
Created: 2/17/2021 7:53 PM
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Charkoudian
Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
Del Hornberger
Natural Resources – Licenses, Permits, Registrations, and Certificates – Digital or Electronic Format
Del Long
Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021)
(Removed - 2/19/2021 12:31 PM)
Created: 2/4/2021 4:01 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Bridges
Community Development Administration – Live Near Your School Program – Establishment
Del Washington
Real Property – Sale of Apartment Facilities – Rights of Qualified Organizations
Del Conaway
Landlord and Tenant – Lease Agreements – Estoppel Certificates and Subordination, Non–Disturbance, and Attornment Agreements
Created: 2/17/2021 5:16 PM
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 123
Dels Bhandari and C. Jackson
Criminal Procedure – Registered Sex Offenders – Entry Onto School Property
Del Luedtke
Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Ways and Means)
Del Pippy
Court Order to Use a Cell Site Simulator or Obtain Location Information From an Electronic Device - Procedures
- HB 670
(Added - 2/16/2021 7:42 AM)
Dels Lierman and Korman
Board of Revenue Estimates and Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Organization and Operations
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Appropriations)
Del Wilkins
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Appropriations)
Del Ebersole
State Department of Education - Infant and Early Childhood Mental Health Consultation Project - Study and Report
(Removed - 2/19/2021 9:39 AM)
Update from County Executive Steuart Pittman on COVID-19 and the County.
Local Bill Hearings: HB921, HB928, HB1141
Voting Session
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders