Day(s)
As of: 5/13/2025 5:03:25 AM
Created: 2/10/2021 10:08 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The Committee will break from 12:45 to 1:30 p.m.
Sens Ferguson and Pinsky
State Board of Education Membership and Terms - Capability and Capacity Study of Education Agencies
Sen Carter
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Incarcerated and Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Academic and Employment Opportunities
Sen Augustine
Public Schools - Centers for Disease Control and Prevention Surveys - Revisions
Sen Washington, et al
Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Sen Washington
Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report
Sen Washington, et al
Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student Data - Pregnant and Parenting Students
Sens Ready and West
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Sen Ready, et al
State Department of Education - Interscholastic Athletics Eligibility Waiver - Graduate Athletes
(Added - 2/15/2021 8:32 AM)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Gallion
Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2021)
Sen Klausmeier
Education – Comprehensive Health Education Program – Instruction on Skin Cancer
Sen Ellis
Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Applications for Student Financial Aid
Sen King
Early Childhood Education – Child Care Provider Support Grant Program (The Child Care Provider Support Act)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Created: 2/23/2021 4:44 PM
4:30 PM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
SB0070
Briefing on SB 414
Sen Young
Collective Bargaining - Teachers at the Maryland School for the Deaf - Separate Bargaining Unit
Sen Cassilly
Lodging Establishments – Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities – Deadlines
(Added - 2/1/2021 4:42 PM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 8:46 AM)
(Added - 2/1/2021 4:42 PM)
Sen Carozza, et al
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Verification
(Added - 2/1/2021 4:42 PM)
(Added - 2/1/2021 4:42 PM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 8:46 AM)
Sen Feldman
Office of Health Care Quality – Influenza Virus Immunization Education and Information – Assisted Living Facilities
(Added - 2/8/2021 8:46 AM)
(Added - 2/2/2021 12:00 PM)
(Added - 2/9/2021 5:11 PM)
Sen Feldman
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Metro Transit Police – Quotas and Police Complaints Board
(Added - 2/5/2021 4:02 PM)
Sen Hough
Correctional Services – Division of Parole and Probation – Definition of Absconding
(Added - 2/9/2021 5:11 PM)
Sen Lee, et al
Criminal Procedure - Probation Before Judgment - Facts Justifying a Finding of Guilt and Suspension of Sentence
(Added - 2/9/2021 5:11 PM)
Sen Sydnor
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Created: 2/25/2021 2:28 PM
7:30 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
9:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 2/11/2021 7:09 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Solomon
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Del Bridges
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Access to New Employees
Del Bhandari
Board of Community College Trustees for Baltimore County - Collective Bargaining - Faculty
Del Harrison
Higher Education - Richard W. Collins III Leadership With Honor Scholarship - Bowie State
Created: 2/24/2021 1:07 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/24/2021 2:19 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Guyton
State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs - Mandated Appropriation
Created: 2/24/2021 6:16 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/23/2021 7:53 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
MEWPA Workgroup
(HB 518/SB 486)
Created: 2/5/2021 3:02 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George’s County – Coal– and Gas–Fired Generating Stations – Prohibitions (Prince George’s County Stop Environmentally Unjust Coal and Gas Plants Act of 2021) PG 410–21
Del Charkoudian
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:08 PM)
Del Washington
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Rate Filings – Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:08 PM)
Del Lisanti
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund – Liability Insurance – School Bus Contractors
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:08 PM)
Del Fraser-Hidalgo
State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
(Jointly assigned to Economic Matters\Environment and Transportation)
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:08 PM)
HB581 -Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Created: 2/7/2021 1:34 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Judiciary)
St. Mary's County Delegation
St. Mary’s County – Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:23 AM)
Del R. Watson
Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Inspection, Performance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran's Law)
Del M. Fisher
Elected Officials – State–Owned Electric Vehicle Charging Stations – Reimbursement
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:23 AM)
Del Lisanti
Public Ethics - Local Officials - Electronic Filing of Financial Disclosure Statements
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:23 AM)
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:23 AM)
Created: 1/21/2021 3:16 PM
5:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Exact time of this subcommittee meeting will be announced after the Bill Hearings are complete
Created: 2/2/2021 7:48 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final bill order below.
Del Crosby
Health Occupations – Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses – Temporary Licensure, Certification, and Registration
(Added - 2/11/2021 3:20 PM)
Del Cullison
Prescription Drug Affordability Board - Plan of Action - Repeal of Date for Submission
(Added - 2/11/2021 3:20 PM)
Del Amprey
Workgroup on Black, Latino, and Other Underrepresented Mental Health Professionals
Del Bagnall
Maryland Insurance Commissioner – Specialty Mental Health Services and Payment of Claims – Enforcement
(Added - 2/11/2021 3:20 PM)
Del Griffith
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
(Removed - 2/22/2021 9:26 AM)
Created: 2/22/2021 1:58 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 276, 674, 806, 811, 873, and 983
Created: 2/10/2021 10:11 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Bills are ordered as they appear below. Each bill sponsor will receive three (3) minutes to provide oral testimony while each witness will receive two (2) minutes to provide oral testimony.
Del Crutchfield
Juvenile Services - Workgroup to Develop Evidence-Based, Research-Based, and Culturally Competent Practices
(Removed - 2/22/2021 4:43 PM)
(Removed - 2/22/2021 4:43 PM)
(Removed - 2/22/2021 4:43 PM)
(Removed - 2/22/2021 4:43 PM)
(Removed - 2/25/2021 12:05 PM)
Created: 2/24/2021 9:38 AM
12:15 PM - Zoom / YouTube
- HBs 23 and 260
The Spkr
Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering
(Added - 2/2/2021 4:14 PM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 9:09 AM)
Del Buckel
Economic Development – Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program – Establishment
(Added - 2/8/2021 9:09 AM)
Del Buckel
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Trade or Business Expenses Resulting in Federal Loan Forgiveness
(Added - 2/8/2021 9:09 AM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 12:24 PM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 9:09 AM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 9:09 AM)
(Added - 2/8/2021 9:09 AM)
Del Mangione
Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering License - Maryland State Fair and Agricultural Society, Inc.
(Removed - 2/2/2021 4:20 PM)
Del Luedtke
Influence on Collective Bargaining – Prohibition on Use of Public Funds and Income Tax Addition Modification
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Ways and Means)
Del Buckel
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Certified Historic Structure and Single-Family, Owner-Occupied Residence - Definitions
Del D. Jones
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Donations to Diaper Banks and Other Charitable Entities
Del McKay
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification for Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Members – Active Status Points
Harford County House Delegation Meeting
Delegation Meeting
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools