Day(s)
As of: 5/28/2023 10:58:38 PM
Created: 1/6/2023 1:06 PM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority
(Removed - 1/12/2023 9:24 AM)
Created: 1/6/2023 1:06 PM
1:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/6/2023 1:06 PM
1:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Created: 2/28/2023 11:12 AM
5:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Blind Industries and Services of Maryland, Board of Trustees of
Walter A. Brown, Ed.D., Baltimore City, District 41
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays, Critical Area Commission for the
Milton M. Malkus, Esq., Dorchester County, District 37
Community Health Resources Commission, Maryland
Maria Hankerson, Prince George's County, District 23
Contract Appeals, Maryland State Board of
Senchal Barrolle, Montgomery County, District 10
Maryland Public-Private Partnership Marketing Corporation, Board of Directors of the
Lawrence Rivitz, Baltimore County, District 11
Open Meetings Law Compliance Board, State
Runako Allsopp, Montgomery County, District 15
Police Training and Standards Commission, Maryland
Dirk Butler, Prince George's County, District 23
Patrick Campbell, Frederick County, District 3
Raymond Kelly, Baltimore City, District 40
Dwarren Lambrith, Baltimore County, District 10
Dorothy Lennig, Howard County, District 9
Ganesha Martin, Montgomery County, District 20
Susan Radcliffe, Talbot County, District 37
Port Commission, Maryland
Karenthia Barber, Baltimore City, District 43
David M. Richardson, Harford County, District 35
Sandy Roberts, Prince George's County, District 23
University System of Maryland Board of Regents
Yehuda Neuberger, Baltimore County, District 11
Created: 2/28/2023 11:13 AM
5:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Community Health Resources Commission, Maryland
Carol M. Masden, Dorchester County, District 37
Destiny-Simone Ramjohn, Ph.D., Baltimore City, District 46
Open Meetings Law Compliance Board, State
Lynn M. Marshall, Esq., Garrett County, District 1
Created: 1/10/2023 3:26 PM
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/23/2023 12:41 PM)
(Added - 1/19/2023 10:20 AM)
(Added - 1/23/2023 12:41 PM)
Department of Information Technology
(Removed - 1/19/2023 10:20 AM)
Created: 2/10/2023 2:26 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Del Charkoudian, et al
Offshore Wind Energy – State Goals and Procurement (Promoting Offshore Wind Energy Resources Act)
Del Fraser-Hidalgo, et al
Climate Change Adaptation and Mitigation Payment Program and Climate Impact Health Coverage Program – Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Economic Matters\Environment and Transportation)
Created: 3/3/2023 10:22 AM
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Voting session will start at 3:00pm or immediately following bill hearings
Del Stewart
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Telephone Solicitation (Stop the Spam Calls Act of 2023)
Del Stewart, et al
Four–Day Workweek Pilot Program and Income Tax Credit – Established (Four–Day Workweek Act of 2023)
(Jointly assigned to Economic Matters\Ways and Means)
Del Fraser-Hidalgo, et al
Environment - Ambient Air Monitoring - Particulate and Fine Particulate Matter
(Jointly assigned to Economic Matters\Environment and Transportation)
Del Queen
Financial Regulation - Modernizing Licensing of Non-Depository Institutions and Elimination of Branch License Requirements
Del Wilkins, et al
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Insurance Identification Card – Multiple Named Insureds
Baltimore City Delegation
Baltimore City - Insurance - Certificates of Guarantee for County Bond Requirements
Del Hornberger
State Board of Electricians - Limited Energy Contractors and Limited Energy Integrators - Licensing
Del Lopez, et al
Financial Institutions – Student Financing Companies – Required Registration and Reporting
Dels Phillips and Ebersole
Baltimore County - Insurance - Certificates of Guarantee for County Bond Requirements
Created: 2/14/2023 11:31 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Del Phillips, et al
Minority Business Enterprises - Calculation of Participation Rates - Procurements From Maryland Correctional Enterprises
Del Phillips, et al
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises and Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Participation Goal Scorecard
Del Harris, et al
State Procurement – Minority Business Enterprise Program – Extension and Reports
Mont Co Deleg and PG Co Deleg
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Minority Business Enterprise Utilization Program – Revisions and Extension MC/PG 101–23
Mont Co Deleg and PG Co Deleg
Montgomery County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Commissioner Requirements and Open Meetings (Montgomery County Planning Trust and Transparency Act of 2023) MC/PG 105-23
Del Bagnall
State Board of Nursing – Peer Advisory Committees, Scopes of Practice, and Licensure Requirements
Del Kerr
Physician Assistants - Parity With Other Health Care Practitioners (Physician Assistant Parity Act of 2023)
Del M. Morgan, et al
State and Local Government - Proof of Vaccination for Employees and Applicants for Employment - Prohibition (Vaccination by Choice Act)
(Removed - 3/2/2023 8:22 PM)
- HB 162
- HB 744
- HB 745