Day(s)
As of: 9/26/2024 6:03:12 PM
Canceled
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
2:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 3/23/2021 3:17 PM
5:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Simonaire
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit for Business Entities - State of Emergency
(Added - 3/24/2021 4:06 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Finance)
(Added - 3/23/2021 5:31 PM)
Sen Rosapepe
Economic Development - COVID-19 Small Business Grant Program (COVID-19 Crisis Small Business Survival Program Act of 2021)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 3/24/2021 4:06 PM)
Created: 3/10/2021 3:18 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Washington
Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program - Alterations (Maryland College Access Act)
(Added - 3/18/2021 10:51 AM)
(Added - 3/18/2021 10:51 AM)
(Added - 3/18/2021 10:51 AM)
Del Rosenberg
Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
(Added - 3/18/2021 10:51 AM)
(Added - 3/18/2021 10:51 AM)
(Added - 3/18/2021 10:51 AM)
Del Clark
Marine Contractor License – Performance of Services – Licensing Requirements and Fees
(Added - 3/16/2021 3:27 PM)
(Added - 3/16/2021 3:27 PM)
(Added - 3/18/2021 10:51 AM)
Del Solomon
Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act)
(Added - 3/18/2021 10:51 AM)
Del Wilson
Consumer Protection - Robocalls and Spam Calls - Website to Report and Annual Report
Del Qi
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program - Alterations
Created: 3/19/2021 5:19 PM
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 3/20/2021 2:48 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 3/22/2021 9:21 AM)
(Added - 3/22/2021 9:21 AM)
(Added - 3/22/2021 9:21 AM)
Chr FIN (Dept), et al
Arts and Entertainment Districts – Artistic Work and Arts and Entertainment Enterprise – Definitions
(Added - 3/22/2021 9:21 AM)
Chr B&T (Dept)
Department of Transportation - Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds - Calculation of Debt Limit
(Added - 3/20/2021 2:59 PM)
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:21 AM)
Sen Peters
Higher Education – Richard W. Collins III Leadership With Honor Scholarship – Bowie State
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:21 AM)
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:21 AM)
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:21 AM)
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:21 AM)
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:21 AM)
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:21 AM)
Sen McCray, et al
Human Services - Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Heat and Eat Program and Study on Maryland Energy Assistance Program Eligibility
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:21 AM)
Created: 3/16/2021 10:53 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr FIN (Dept)
Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
Chr FIN (Dept)
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements
Chr JPR (Dept)
Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Created: 3/24/2021 1:24 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Charkoudian
Maryland Energy Administration Study on Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems and Geothermal Energy Workgroup
Del Lierman, et al
Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Digital Inclusion - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcohol Density Zones and Licenses PG 307–21
Chr EHE (Dept)
State Board of Public Accountancy – Education Requirements – Obsolete References
Sen Cassilly
Lodging Establishments – Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities – Deadlines
Created: 3/23/2021 5:07 PM
3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Subcommittee will follow bill hearings and voting.
Created: 3/12/2021 2:31 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Klausmeier
Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study
Time of subcommittee meeting will be announced after Bill Hearings are complete.
Created: 3/17/2021 6:27 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Please note that the House will not hold hearings on identically crossfiled bills, per guidance listed on the homepage of the MGA website. Final bill order below.
Chr JPR (Dept)
Inspection of Public Records – Notaries Public – Disclosure of Home Address and Phone Number
Sen Eckardt
Certified Nursing Assistants – Certificate Renewal – Training Program Requirements
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:55 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:55 PM)
Sen Simonaire
Funeral Establishments and Crematories – Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans – Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:55 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:55 PM)
Sen Eckardt
Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:55 PM)
Sen Waldstreicher
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:55 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:55 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:55 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:55 PM)
Sen Griffith
Consolidation of the Procurement Improvement Council and the Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:55 PM)
Sens Smith and Carozza
Procurement – Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Reserve Program and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:55 PM)
Created: 3/12/2021 5:48 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
*BILLS ARE ORDERED AS THEY APPEAR BELOW* / Sponsor-Only Hearings: SBs 109, 145, 146, 156, 222, 267 | Per the Opposite Chamber Bill Hearing Guidelines: All Committees in the House of Delegates will not hold hearings on identically crossfiled bills. Bill with signicficant changes and non-crossfiled legislation will generally have sponsor only hearings but may add witnesses at the discretion of the Chair.
Sen Kramer
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Sen Hough
Family Law - Preventing or Interfering With Report of Suspected Sexual Abuse of a Child - Statute of Limitations
Chr JPR (Dept)
Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Merger of Programs and Expanded Participant Eligibility
Chr JPR (Dept)
Family Law – Investigation of Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect – Preliminary Report to State’s Attorney
(Removed - 3/22/2021 2:27 PM)
Sen Kelley, et al
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
(Removed - 3/22/2021 2:27 PM)
Sens Elfreth and Hettleman
Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
(Removed - 3/22/2021 2:27 PM)
(Removed - 3/22/2021 2:27 PM)
Created: 3/12/2021 4:32 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
All hearings on Senate Bills are Sponsor only.
All hearings on Senate Bills are Sponsor only.
All hearings on Senate Bills are Sponsor only.
All hearings on Senate Bills are Sponsor only.
Del Griffith
Primary and Secondary Education – Repeating Previous Grade Level – Authorization (Education Recovery Act of 2021)
(Removed - 3/15/2021 7:11 PM)
(Removed - 3/15/2021 7:11 PM)
Sen Bailey
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Electric Retractable Room Partitions - Operation Requirements
(Removed - 3/22/2021 10:32 AM)
(Removed - 3/22/2021 10:32 AM)
Created: 3/23/2021 2:49 PM
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Subcomittee will meet at 11:30 am or immediately after the Floor Session.
Created: 1/9/2021 7:45 AM
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
The meeting will be conducted via webinar. To view click here
General Meeting
Bill hearing for crossover bills.