Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 6/4/2023 7:09:54 AM
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
Senate
Created: 3/20/2023 8:18 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Updated Bill Order
Del Kaufman, et al

Public Utilities - Street Lighting Equipment - Acquisitions and Reporting (County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act)
Del Charkoudian

Social Services Programs - Eligibility and Enrollment
(Added - 3/21/2023 3:28 PM)
Del Foley, et al

Local Government - Regulatory Powers - Regulation of Invasive Bamboo
Del Chisholm, et al

Anne Arundel County - School Vehicles - Duration of Operation
(Added - 3/21/2023 3:00 PM)
Del Queen, et al

Utility Account Holders - Victims of Abuse - Protections
Del Guzzone

Public Information Act - Inspection of E-Mail Addresses and Telephone Numbers
Del Fraser-Hidalgo, et al

Electric Vehicle Charging Infrastructure - Requirements (Electric Vehicle Charging Reliability Act)
(Added - 3/21/2023 3:28 PM)
Dels Pasteur and Holmes

Housing and Community Development - Common Ownership Community Website
Del Jackson

Public Service Commission – Judicial Review – Proceedings
Del Terrasa

Municipal Elections – Candidates – Reports of Donations and Disbursements
(Added - 3/21/2023 3:00 PM)
Del Griffith, et al

Study on the Utilization of the Expedited Licensing Process for Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses
Del Charkoudian

Public Service Companies - Annual Report on Votes Cast at Meetings of Regional Transmission Organizations
(Added - 3/21/2023 3:28 PM)
Del Howard

Real Estate Brokers - Disability or Death and Termination of Employment of a Broker
(Added - 3/21/2023 1:32 PM)
Del Rosenberg, et al

Election Reform Act of 2023
(Added - 3/21/2023 3:00 PM)
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Land Use - Development of Neglected Property PG 406-23
(Removed - 3/21/2023 3:34 PM)
Del Kaiser, et al

Public Information Act - Decisions of the State Public Information Act Compliance Board - Appeals
(Removed - 3/21/2023 3:34 PM)
Del Munoz, et al

State Information Technology - Prohibited Applications and Websites
(Removed - 3/21/2023 3:34 PM)

Created: 3/28/2023 9:15 AM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Click to return on the top page