Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 9/27/2023 11:42:41 AM
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: March 28, 2023 9:15 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
March 28, 2023 3:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: March 28, 2023 2:41 PM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Other
April 3, 2023 4:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

Finance Committee
Change made: March 28, 2023 11:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 28, 2023 2:30 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
HB0283
Del Kaiser, et al

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Gender-Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act)
HB0322
Del Bagnall, et al

Public Health - Home- and Community-Based Services for Children and Youth
HB0611
Del Kelly, et al

State Board of Nursing – Sunset Extension, Licensure Exceptions, and Board Operations and Membership
HB1148
Del Moon, et al

Behavioral Health Care - Treatment and Access (Behavioral Health Model for Maryland)
SB0582
Sen Augustine

Behavioral Health Care - Treatment and Access (Behavioral Health Model for Maryland)
SB0960
Sen Kelly

State Board of Nursing – Sunset Extension, Licensure Exceptions, and Board Operations and Membership

Change made: March 28, 2023 6:22 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 29, 2023 3:30 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 28, 2023 7:36 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 30, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
HB0513
Del Queen

Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage - Enforcement
ADDED: 7:36 PM

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: March 28, 2023 10:37 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
March 28, 2023 2:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 28, 2023 10:48 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
March 29, 2023 2:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: March 28, 2023 7:35 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
March 29, 2023 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 28, 2023 11:58 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 30, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0574
St. Mary's County Delegation

St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
REMOVED: 11:58 AM

Capital Budget Subcommittee
Change made: March 28, 2023 1:17 PM - HEARING ADDED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Voting Session
March 29, 2023 12:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Economic Matters Committee
Change made: March 28, 2023 3:35 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
March 30, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
SB0508
Sens Elfreth and Feldman

Hemp Farming Program - Consumable Hemp Products
REMOVED: 3:35 PM

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: March 28, 2023 11:14 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
March 28, 2023 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0208
Del Lehman, et al

Street Racing and Exhibition Driving - Prohibited Acts, Enforcement, and Penalties
ADDED: 11:14 AM

Change made: March 28, 2023 2:58 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
March 29, 2023 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee
Change made: March 28, 2023 9:27 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 29, 2023 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB 480 and SB 286.
ADDED: 9:27 AM

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: March 28, 2023 1:25 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
March 28, 2023 2:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
SB0460
Sen M. Washington, et al

Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Gender–Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act)
ADDED: 1:25 PM
SB0534
Sen Gile, et al

Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2023
ADDED: 1:25 PM
SB0581
Sens Klausmeier and Mautz

Behavioral Health Care Coordination Value-Based Purchasing Pilot Program
ADDED: 1:25 PM
SB0798
Sen Ferguson, et al

Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Freedom
ADDED: 1:25 PM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: March 28, 2023 4:31 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
March 29, 2023 4:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0001
Del Wilson

Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations (The Child Victims Act of 2023)
HB0526
St. Mary's County Delegation

St. Mary's County - Transfer of Child Support Unit and Personnel to the Child Support Administration
HB1066
Del Vogel, et al

Hate Crimes - Commission on Hate Crime Response and Prevention - Establishment
SB0054
Sen Lam

Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practice – Repeal
SB0071
Sen Brooks

Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearages - Workers' Compensation
SB0074
Sen Bailey

Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Prior Convictions
SB0106
Sen Sydnor

Courts - Judgments - Exemptions From Execution
SB0129
Sens Kelly and Beidle

Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Repeal of Spousal Defense
SB0150
Sen Augustine (JtCMPF)

Maryland Tort Claims Act - Denial of Claims - Notice
SB0211
Sen West, et al

Probation Before Judgment – Probation Agreements
SB0292
Sen Waldstreicher, et al

Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response
SB0540
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc)

Human Relations - Civil Rights Enforcement - Powers of the Attorney General
SB0792
Sen West

Estates and Trusts - Registered Domestic Partnerships

Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee
Change made: March 28, 2023 10:03 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
March 28, 2023 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Public Utilities Subcommittee
Change made: March 28, 2023 9:50 AM - HEARING ADDED
Public Utilities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 28, 2023 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Other
Anne Arundel
Change made: March 28, 2023 9:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Anne Arundel - Other
March 29, 2023 10:45 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Bill Votes

Change made: March 28, 2023 9:51 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Anne Arundel - Other
March 31, 2023 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Anne Arundel County House Delegation Meeting

Baltimore County
Change made: March 28, 2023 9:54 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore County - Briefing
March 31, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing-Maryland Public Defender Natasha Dartigue

Harford
Change made: March 28, 2023 2:38 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Harford - Other
March 30, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Harford County Delegation Meeting

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Change made: March 28, 2023 2:14 PM - HEARING ADDED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
April 20, 2023 9:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business.

State Debt, Commission on
Change made: March 28, 2023 1:55 PM - HEARING UPDATED
State Debt, Commission on - Other
April 18, 2023 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
(Previous Location: Virtual Meeting)
Annual meeting to recommend a State tax rate on real and personal property

Click to return on the top page