Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 6/6/2023 10:11:59 PM
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
House
Created: 3/20/2023 2:47 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Sen Hayes

Baltimore City - Commercial Use - Definition
*This bill is sponsor only oral testimony
(Added - 3/22/2023 1:06 PM)
Sen M. Washington

Accessory Dwelling Unit Policy Task Force
Sen M. Washington

Community Health and Safety Works Grant Program and Fund - Establishment
(Added - 3/21/2023 3:45 PM)
Sen Muse

Town of Forest Heights (Prince George's County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
*This bill is sponsor only oral testimony
(Added - 3/21/2023 2:10 PM)
Sen James, et al

Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Service Dogs
*This bill is sponsor only for oral testimony
Sen Carter

Real Estate - Real Estate Brokerage Services and Termination of Residential Real Estate Contracts (The Anthony Moorman Act)

Created: 3/27/2023 3:37 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Del Lehman, et al

Street Racing and Exhibition Driving - Prohibited Acts, Enforcement, and Penalties
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Judiciary)
(Added - 3/28/2023 11:14 AM)

Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Canceled
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page