Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 6/4/2023 7:01:29 AM
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
Senate
Created: 3/21/2023 11:13 AM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
All bills are sponsor only except for HB 277.
Del Arentz, et al

Caroline and Queen Anne's Counties - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Residency Requirement
Harford County Delegation

Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
Harford County Delegation

Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-HTF (Hatchet Throwing Facility) License
(Added - 3/24/2023 12:50 PM)
Harford County Delegation

Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alteration of License Quota
Howard County Delegation

Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Public Hearing Ho. Co. 13-23
Howard County Delegation

Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Residency Requirements Ho. Co. 11-23
Howard County Delegation

Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Petition of Support Requirement Ho. Co. 12-23
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Holders of Class B–BWL (Clubhouse/Lodge) License and Class 7 Micro–Brewery License MC 16–23
(Added - 3/21/2023 12:21 PM)
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Alcohol Beverage Services - Advisory Board MC 04-23
(Added - 3/21/2023 12:21 PM)
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licensing PG 305-23
(Added - 3/21/2023 12:21 PM)
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-Stadium (Baseball Stadium) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License PG 306-23
(Added - 3/21/2023 12:21 PM)
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses, Inspections, Penalties, and Workgroup PG 302-23
(Added - 3/21/2023 12:21 PM)
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Main Street Laurel Development PG 404-23
(Added - 3/21/2023 12:21 PM)
Frederick County Delegation

Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Golf Simulator Facility
Frederick County Delegation

Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Display of License
Frederick County Delegation

Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Frederick County Delegation

Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Miniature Golf Course License
Frederick County Delegation

Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B–HTF (Hatchet Throwing Facility) License
Frederick County Delegation

Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer
Frederick County Delegation

Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits

Created: 3/28/2023 11:33 AM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
2:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Del Kaiser, et al

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Gender-Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act)
Del Bagnall, et al

Public Health - Home- and Community-Based Services for Children and Youth
Del Kelly, et al

State Board of Nursing – Sunset Extension, Licensure Exceptions, and Board Operations and Membership
Sen Kelly

State Board of Nursing – Sunset Extension, Licensure Exceptions, and Board Operations and Membership
Del Moon, et al

Behavioral Health Care - Treatment and Access (Behavioral Health Model for Maryland)
Sen Augustine

Behavioral Health Care - Treatment and Access (Behavioral Health Model for Maryland)

Click to return on the top page