Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 6/9/2023 6:52:48 PM
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
House
Created: 3/22/2023 7:24 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Special Witness Guidelines
All bills are sponsor only, unless otherwise noted.
Sen Ferguson, et al

Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Freedom
Sens Beidle and Augustine

Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
Sens Klausmeier and Mautz

Behavioral Health Care Coordination Value-Based Purchasing Pilot Program
Sen Hester

Public Health - Home- and Community-Based Services for Children and Youth
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
Sen Kramer, et al

Grocery Stores and Restaurants - Automated External Defibrillator Program (Joe Sheya Act)
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Economic Matters)
Sen Guzzone

Animal Testing and Research - Human-Relevant Research Funding and Animal Testing and Research Contributions
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Ways and Means)
Sens Hershey and Hayes

Hospitals - Financial Assistance - Medical Bill Reimbursement Process
Sen M. Washington, et al

Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Gender–Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act)
Sen M. Washington

Human Services - Maryland Statewide Independent Living Council
Sens Ellis and Hester

Health and Human Services Transportation Improvement Act of 2023
Sens Carozza and Mautz

Behavioral Health Programs - Residential Programs - Food Service Facility Requirements
Sen Zucker, et al

Medicaid Waiver Programs – Waitlist and Registry Reduction (End the Wait Act)
Sens Lam and Salling

Health Services Cost Review Commission - Members - Appointment
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
Sen McCray

Maternal Mortality Review Program - Local Teams - Access to Information and Records
Sen Guzzone

Recovery Residence Grant Program – Establishment
Sens Gile and Elfreth

Public Health - Parkinson's Disease - Advisory Committee and Website
Chr FIN (Dept)

Department of Disabilities - State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Maryland Commission on Disabilities - Alterations
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.

Created: 3/27/2023 8:20 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
2:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Sen M. Washington, et al

Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Gender–Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act)
(Added - 3/28/2023 1:25 PM)
Sen Gile, et al

Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2023
(Added - 3/28/2023 1:25 PM)
Sens Klausmeier and Mautz

Behavioral Health Care Coordination Value-Based Purchasing Pilot Program
(Added - 3/28/2023 1:25 PM)
Sen Ferguson, et al

Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Freedom
(Added - 3/28/2023 1:25 PM)

Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 3/23/2023 4:19 PM
Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee - Work Session
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
HB 1232 and SB 184.

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 3/23/2023 4:21 PM
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
HB 354, HB 703, SB 26, SB 354, and SB 584.
HB 1155.
(Added - 3/23/2023 4:54 PM)

Click to return on the top page