Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/8/2023 7:35:21 PM
Monday, March 29, 2021
Senate
Created: 3/29/2021 2:01 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Overview
4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
HB1372 - Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions

Created: 3/24/2021 10:27 AM
Executive Nominations Committee - Appearing
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Please note that portions of the meeting may be closed in accordance with Open Meetings Act procedures.
Health, Maryland Department
Dennis R. Schrader, Howard County, District 13
Education, State Board of
Joan A. Mele-McCarthy, D.A., Calvert County, District 27
University System of Maryland Board of Regents
Aaliyah B. Edwards, Baltimore County, District 8
Ellen R. Fish, Baltimore County, District 11
Gary T. Gill, Baltimore County, District 11
James N. Holzapfel, Washington County, District 2
Robert R. Neall, Anne Arundel County, District 33
Nathaniel L. Sansom, Wicomico County, District 37

Created: 3/24/2021 10:28 AM
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appearing
5:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Labor Relations Board, State
LeRoy A. Wilkison, Talbot County, District 37
University System of Maryland Board of Regents
Meredith M. Mears, Wicomico County, District 37
Louis M. Pope, Howard County, District 9
Allegany College Board of Trustees
Michele R. Martz, Out-of-State (WV)
James R. Pyles, Allegany County, District 1
Anne Arundel Community College Board of Trustees
Allinda J. Price-Jones, Anne Arundel County, District 31
Baltimore City Board of Elections
Evette Matthews, Baltimore City, District 45
Baltimore City Board of License Commissioners
Robert E. Guye, Sr., Baltimore City, District 45
Albert J. Matricianni, Baltimore City, District 43
Cecil County Board of Elections
Stephen J. Stiles, Cecil County, District 35
Frederick County Board of License Commissioners
Joan M. Aquilino, Frederick County, District 4
Montgomery College Board of Trustees
Omar A. Lazo, Montgomery County, District 19
Somerset County Board of Elections
James S. Lane, Somerset County, District 38
Washington County Board of Commissioners
Charles A. Burkett, Jr., Washington County, District 2
Washington County Board of License Commissioners
Robert J. Buczkowski, Washington County, District 2

House
Created: 3/28/2021 7:34 PM
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Guzzone, et al

Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sen Elfreth

Transfer With Success Act
Sen Benson

Education – Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships – Eligibility
Sen Elfreth, et al

Maryland 529 Program – Board Authority and State Contribution – Alterations
Sen Peters

Higher Education – Richard W. Collins III Leadership With Honor Scholarship – Bowie State

Business Regulation Subcommittee - (Economic Matters Committee)
Created: 3/26/2021 5:03 PM
Business Regulation Subcommittee - Work Session
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 3/26/2021 3:15 PM
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
*This vote session will begin at NOON*
Del J. Lewis

Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act)
Sen West, et al

Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act)

Created: 3/24/2021 4:36 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee - Bill Hearing
9:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Crosby

Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission

Other
Baltimore City
Created: 3/26/2021 1:39 PM
Voting Session
3:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Del Wells (BCA)

Baltimore City – Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City
Sen McCray, et al

Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Created: 3/23/2021 2:27 PM
6:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.

No. 7 - Prince George's County
Created: 3/25/2021 12:11 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Prince George's County Senate Delegation Meeting

Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup
Created: 3/25/2021 8:49 AM
4:00 PM to 5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page