Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 6/16/2024 4:27:34 AM
Monday, April 8, 2024
Senate
Created: 4/8/2024 9:44 AM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
11:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/8/2024 3:43 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
4:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/8/2024 10:49 AM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
11:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/8/2024 11:01 AM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
11:15 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/8/2024 3:08 PM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
4:15 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Del Martinez, et al

Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage for Prostheses (So Every Body Can Move Act)

Created: 4/8/2024 8:18 PM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
8:50 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/7/2024 6:57 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
11:00 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Created: 4/6/2024 1:19 PM
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
10:15 AM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/8/2024 1:58 PM
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
4:22 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/6/2024 4:24 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Voting Session
9:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/6/2024 4:09 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
10:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Del Hartman

Worcester County - Motor Home and Recreational Trailer Shows - Out-of-State Dealers
(Added - 4/7/2024 7:12 PM)
Sen Carozza

Worcester County – Motor Home and Recreational Trailer Shows – Out–of–State Dealers
(Added - 4/7/2024 7:12 PM)
Sen Folden

Motor Vehicles - Specially Designed Vintage Reproduction Registration Plates
(Added - 4/7/2024 7:12 PM)

Created: 4/8/2024 2:21 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
4:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/8/2024 2:53 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
3:45 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/7/2024 10:03 PM
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
9:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Sen Carter, et al

Juvenile Law - Child in Need of Supervision - Mandatory Petition (NyKayla Strawder Memorial Act)
(Added - 4/8/2024 8:45 AM)
Sen McCray, et al

Qualifying Nonprofit Organizations - Training and Reentry Services - Funding
(Added - 4/8/2024 8:45 AM)
Sen McKay

Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program
(Added - 4/8/2024 8:45 AM)

Created: 4/8/2024 2:22 PM
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
3:45 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD

Other
No hearings scheduled for today
Click to return on the top page