Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 6/16/2024 7:46:43 AM
Thursday, April 11, 2024
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 4/1/2024 12:58 PM
10:00 AM - Atman-Glazer Building, Room 164 A&B, 45 Calvert St. , Annapolis, MD 21401
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 823 9943 2669 Passcode: 464155 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
Space is limited and members of the public wishing to attend in person are asked to register. To register for the meeting go to https://app.smartsheet.com/b/form/26905025189a40aba35a1d12ffee4a49
There is no cost to attend the meeting.
Meeting of the Maryland Consortium of Coordinated Community Supports.

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 3/20/2024 8:23 AM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To watch the livestream, click here and click on "Stream" under the appropriate date
Additional meeting information will be available at https://mdschoolconstruction.org
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business

State Debt, Commission on
Created: 2/29/2024 3:53 PM
10:00 AM - Assembly Room #114-116, Louis L. Goldstein Treasury Bldg., 80 Calvert St., Annapolis, MD
Annual meeting to recommend a State tax rate on real and personal property.

Click to return on the top page