Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/8/2022 5:45:06 PM
Thursday, December 8, 2022
Senate
Created: 12/8/2022 10:20 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
10:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
10:30 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
***TESTING***
Sen Augustine

test bill

Canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Voting Session
1:40 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
**TESTING**
Sen Augustine

test bill

Canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Voting Session
2:15 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
*TESTING*
Sen Augustine

test bill

Canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Voting Session
2:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Voting Session
2:45 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
*TESTING*
Sen Augustine

test bill

Created: 12/8/2022 2:28 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Voting Session
2:45 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
*TESTING*
Sen Augustine

test bill

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR)
Created: 11/29/2022 10:04 AM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Proposed Regulation: DLS Control No. 22-406
(Added - 12/6/2022 11:38 AM)
Proposed Regulation: DLS Control No. 22-407
(Added - 12/6/2022 11:38 AM)
Proposed Regulation: DLS Control No. 22-275
(Added - 12/7/2022 12:08 PM)
Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services: Police Training Commission
Emergency Regulations: DLS Control Nos. 22-406 and 22-407
(Removed - 12/2/2022 11:26 AM)
Proposed Regulations: DLS Control Nos. 22-406 and 22-407
(Removed - 12/6/2022 11:38 AM)

Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
Created: 12/7/2022 3:40 PM
10:00 AM - Google Meet Video Conference
Meeting Video
Phone Number: (US)+1 505-738-1767 PIN: 395 128 169#
Body-Worn Camera updates and legislation for the upcoming 2023 Legislative Session.

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 11/3/2022 4:11 PM
12:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 814 5814 5747 Passcode: 953584 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
Meeting of the Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports.

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 11/29/2022 2:29 PM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To watch the livestream click here and click on "Stream" under the appropriate date
Additional meeting information will be available at https://mdschoolconstruction.org
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business and approval of 75% of the Capital Improvement Program.

Click to return on the top page