Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 6/23/2021 9:26:44 PM
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology and Biotechnology
Created: 6/11/2021 8:41 AM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
State and Local Cybersecurity Preparedness and Governance in Maryland
--What is the background of cybersecurity preparedness and governance in Maryland?
--What are the cybersecurity needs of local governments?
--What innovative or technological approaches exist to mitigate risk and strengthen data management?
--What is the cost of cybersecurity?

Joint Committee on Unemployment Insurance Oversight
Created: 6/14/2021 3:24 PM
Briefing
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing from the Maryland Department of Labor on Implementation of UI Legislation.

No. 6 - Montgomery County
Created: 6/8/2021 8:11 PM
12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting

Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities, Oversight Committee on
Created: 5/27/2021 1:58 PM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
To join via video conference, click here
To join via phone dial: +1 570-285-4521
PIN: 764477950
Regularly scheduled meeting.

Click to return on the top page