Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 1/24/2022 11:56:08 PM
Monday, January 24, 2022
Senate
Created: 1/5/2022 11:31 AM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services

House
Created: 1/3/2022 4:10 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Fiscal briefing by the Department of Legislative Services

Created: 1/21/2022 2:46 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
4:15 PM - Zoom / YouTube
HBs 82 & 177 have been withdrawn by sponsor
Del Hill

Department of General Services – Energy–Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2022)
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
Del Crosby

General Provisions – Standard Time – Year–Round Daylight Saving Time
Del Amprey

Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, and Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 1/17/2022 3:39 PM
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on 9-8-8: Suicide Prevention Hotline
The Health Services Cost Review Commission’s report on Behavioral Health Emergency Department Wait Times and Service Improvements in Maryland

Other
Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Created: 1/5/2022 12:35 PM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Webex-Teleconference
Due to Covid-19, this meeting will be held through GotoWebinar-teleconference only.
To join online click here
TBD

Montgomery
Created: 1/15/2022 8:00 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Land Use, Transportation, and Public Safety Committee
Meeting Video
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Land Use, Transportation, and Public Safety Committee.

Click to return on the top page