Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/30/2023 5:20:18 PM
Monday, January 30, 2023
Senate
Created: 1/25/2023 10:09 AM
Executive Nominations Committee - Appearing
5:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
District Court, Anne Arundel County (District 7)
John Peter McKenna, Jr., Anne Arundel County, District 33
District Court, Baltimore City (District 1)
Jennifer Etheridge, Esq., Baltimore City, District 46
Kay N. Harding, Baltimore City, District 46
Carol Magid Johnson, Baltimore City, District 41
Darren Lee Kadish, Baltimore City, District 46
Michele Bernice Lambert, Baltimore City, District 41
Rachel E. Skolnik, Baltimore City, District 41
District Court, Caroline County (District 3)
Joseph A. Riley, Caroline County, District 36
District Court, Charles County (District 4)
Patrick Joseph Devine, Charles County, District 28
District Court, Harford County (District 9)
Tracey Johns Delp, Harford County, District 34
District Court, Howard County (District 10)
Pamila J. Brown, Howard County, District 12
Allison M. Sayers, Howard County, District 13
District Court, Montgomery County (District 6)
John Christian Moffett, Montgomery County, District 15
District Court, Prince George's County (District 5)
Llamilet Gutierrez, Out-of-State ()
District Court, Worcester County (District 2)
Cathi Van de Meulebroecke Coates, Worcester County, District 38

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Montgomery
Created: 1/24/2023 11:52 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Land Use, Transportation, and Public Safety Committee
Meeting Video
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Land Use, Transportation, and Public Safety Committee.

Created: 1/24/2023 11:56 AM
7:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Metro Washington Area Committee
Meeting Video
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Metro Washington Area Committee.

No. 4 - Baltimore County
Created: 1/27/2023 11:34 AM
4:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Mr. Terry Hickey, Director, Baltimore County Department of Housing and Community Development will brief the Delegation on County Executive Johnny Olszewski's proposed package of foundational legislative reforms to expand access to new housing opportunities that address community concerns in Baltimore County.

Click to return on the top page