Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 10/20/2021 7:40:25 PM
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Assessment and Funding of School Facilities, Workgroup on the
Created: 10/7/2021 10:12 AM
Briefing
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on:
1) the school facilities assessment;
2) the cost-share forumula; and
3) the Revolving Loan Fund.

Board of Public Works
Created: 8/17/2021 4:27 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Joint Committee on the Management of Public Funds
Created: 7/28/2021 11:09 AM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Update from Comptroller, Treasurer, Office of Legislative Audits, and Maryland Municipal League.
(Added - 10/18/2021 3:41 PM)
Update from Comptroller, Treasurer, and Office of Legislative Audits.
(Removed - 10/18/2021 3:41 PM)

Click to return on the top page