Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/3/2023 8:47:31 PM
Friday, February 3, 2023
Senate
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/6/2023 1:06 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following session.

Health and Human Services Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/6/2023 1:06 PM
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following session.

Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/6/2023 1:06 PM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following session.

House
Created: 1/10/2023 2:14 PM
Appropriations Committee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Early Childhood Subcommittee - (Ways and Means Committee)
Canceled
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Palakovich Carr

Public Schools - Anaphylactic Food Allergies - Guidelines

Created: 2/2/2023 10:29 AM
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Work Session
12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
HB0078

Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 1/17/2023 11:28 AM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Anne Arundel County House Delegation Meeting
(Added - 1/17/2023 11:37 AM)
Anne Arundel County Delegation Meeting
(Removed - 1/17/2023 11:37 AM)

Baltimore County
Created: 2/1/2023 1:37 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing-Tradepoint Atlantic
Local Bill Hearings: HB348,
(Added - 2/2/2023 10:02 AM)
Bill Votes: HB166, HB175, HB210, HB222, and HB248
Local Bill Hearings: HB348, HB381
(Removed - 2/2/2023 10:02 AM)

Eastern Shore
Created: 1/6/2023 9:25 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Various Topics

Frederick
Created: 1/31/2023 4:00 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Weekly Scheduled Frederick County Delegation Meeting.

Montgomery
Created: 2/1/2023 1:46 PM
9:15 AM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Created: 2/2/2023 3:07 PM
8:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 838 1995 7886 Passcode: 724562 Dial-In # 1-301-715-8592
Meeting Agenda

Prince George's
Created: 1/23/2023 3:36 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Prince George's County House Delegation Meeting

Click to return on the top page