Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 10/28/2021 10:19:37 AM
Thursday, October 28, 2021
Senate
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 10/4/2021 11:39 AM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Briefing
2:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Joint with the House Education and Economic Development Subcommittee
Briefing on Maryland Department of Labor - BEACON Mobile Application

House
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 9/30/2021 12:19 PM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Briefing
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Maryland Dept. of Labor - BEACON Mobile Application

Other
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Created: 9/20/2021 9:28 AM
6:00 PM to 8:00 PM - Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Southern Maryland Redistricting Hearing
North Point High School, Cafeteria, 2500 Davis Road, Waldorf, MD 20603
Meeting Agenda
Guidelines for Public Hearings and Submission of Testimony and Plans
Legislative Redistricting

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 10/20/2021 9:34 AM
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 978 5066 0128 Passcode: 878519
Dial-in#: 301-715-8592 Meeting ID: 978 5066 0128 Passcode: 878519
Additional opportunity for members of the public to ask questions regarding the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals. CHRC will also respond to any follow-up questions from participants from the October 26 meeting at Coppin State University.

Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Created: 10/13/2021 9:27 AM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Webex-Teleconference
Due to COVID-19, this meeting will be held via Webinar-teleconference. To join the meeting click here
TBD

Maryland Orphans Courts, Task Force to Study
Created: 10/18/2021 2:37 PM
11:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To view the meeting click here
Meeting to fulfill mandate of House Bill 681.

OIS Testing
Created: 10/28/2021 8:40 AM
6:00 PM - Remote Stream Location / YouTube
*OIS Testing*

Click to return on the top page