Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 9/22/2021 9:48:01 PM
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
Senate
Created: 9/1/2021 10:20 AM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
12:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Please see Appropriation Committee's hearing schedule to watch live on YouTube
Update on Pandemic-related Funding Distributed to the State
(Added - 9/1/2021 10:24 AM)
Update on Federal Funding Distributed to the State
(Removed - 9/1/2021 10:24 AM)

House
Created: 8/17/2021 10:04 AM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Update on federal funding distributed to the State
(Added - 9/16/2021 12:19 PM)

Other
Assessment and Funding of School Facilities, Workgroup on the
Created: 8/20/2021 6:08 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Joint Committee on Federal Relations
Created: 9/1/2021 10:25 AM
Briefing
12:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Joint briefing with the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, the House Appropriations Committee, and the Joint Committee on the Management of Public Funds.
The live stream link for this meeting is available on the hearing schedule for the Appropriations Committee.
Update on pandemic-related federal funding distributed to the State.

Joint Committee on the Management of Public Funds
Created: 9/1/2021 10:40 AM
Briefing
12:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Joint Briefing with the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, the House Appropriations Committee, and the Joint Committee on Federal Relations.
The live stream link for this meeting is available on the hearing schedule for the House Appropriations Committee.
Update on pandemic-related federal funding distributed to the State.

Click to return on the top page