Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/5/2022 11:35:10 PM
Monday, December 5, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 11/21/2022 2:48 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Framework, Design & RFP Subcommittee Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 471 747 7346 Passcode: Xkie4R Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
Meeting of the Framework, Design & RFP Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports.

Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority
Created: 12/1/2022 12:55 PM
12:00 PM - Conference Call
Conference Call In Number: (US) +1 402-922-6552 PIN: 306 973 236#
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority Meeting

Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board
Created: 11/30/2022 4:03 PM
3:00 PM - 1701 World Trade Center, 401 East Pratt St. Baltimore, MD
Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board.

New Legislators Orientation Program, Maryland General Assembly
Created: 11/2/2022 2:51 PM
8:00 AM - Senate and House Chambers, The State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
Orientation program for newly elected legislators.

Click to return on the top page