Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/26/2023 9:21:59 PM
Thursday, January 26, 2023
Senate
Created: 1/17/2023 3:31 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services on Federal Funds including ARPA and Infrastructure Investment

Created: 1/12/2023 1:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on NCHEMS Report on MHEC Program Review

Created: 1/15/2023 6:46 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Jackson

Housing and Community Development - Homeowner's Extreme Weather Mitigation and Preparation Grant Program
Sen McCray

Maryland Electricians Act – Revisions
Sen Kagan

Public Safety - 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information
Sen Kagan

Open Meetings Act - State Ethics Commission (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act of 2023)
Sen Brooks

Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services - Journeyman License - Qualifications

Created: 1/25/2023 5:15 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
4:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Beidle

Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Civil Commissions - Presentation and Reporting
Sen Bailey

Natural Resources – Blue and Flathead Catfish Finfish Trotline License – Establishment
Sen Ellis

Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Student FAFSA Data - Reporting Requirement

Created: 1/13/2023 2:34 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - Fiscal Briefing
2:00 PM - Financial Institutions 101 (A briefing from the Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation)

Canceled
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Briefing: Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Practices for Disabled Prisoners

House
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 1/11/2023 12:29 PM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on the NCHEMS Report on MHEC Program Review

Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 1/11/2023 12:31 PM
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on Juvenile Justice Issues

Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 1/11/2023 12:32 PM
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on MDOT Major Projects

Created: 1/20/2023 12:16 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Maryland Insurance Administration
Introduction to MIA Property & Casualty 101
People’s Insurance Counsel
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund

Created: 1/17/2023 3:09 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Maryland Department of Agriculture - Agency Overview
State of Agriculture
(Added - 1/19/2023 11:10 AM)

Created: 1/12/2023 4:24 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Del Hill

Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings - Prohibition on Rent Increases and Sealing of Court Records
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Judiciary)
Del Amprey

Counties and State Legislative Districts - Food Environment Reports
Del Amprey

Community Development Administration - Live Near Where You Teach Program - Establishment
Del Stewart

Manufactured Homes – Sale of Manufactured Housing Communities (Manufactured Housing Modernization Act of 2023)
Del Arentz

Condominiums - Declarations and Mandatory Insurance Coverage - Alterations
Del Charkoudian

Condominiums - Common Elements - Clean Energy Equipment
Del Holmes

Residential Owners in Common Ownership Communities Bill of Rights
Del Holmes

Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Del Holmes

Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings

Created: 1/10/2023 3:36 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Overview of Health Occupations Boards and Health Care Workforce Shortage Issues

Created: 1/21/2023 9:20 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Bill hearings to begin at 3pm or following the briefing.
Del Kelly, et al

Commission on Public Health - Establishment

Created: 1/17/2023 4:01 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Acevero

Custodial Interrogation of Minors - Admissibility of Statements
Dels Moon and Palakovich Carr

Child Support Enforcement - Occupational and Recreational Licenses - Taxpayer Identification Number
Del Atterbeary

Family Law - Grounds for Divorce

Created: 1/9/2023 1:16 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services
Agenda
Presentation

Created: 1/9/2023 1:19 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Maryland Comptroller
Agenda
Presentation

Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Canceled
4:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
AIB Advisory Committee Pillar 4
Meeting Video
NOTE: The Agenda and Meeting Materials will be posted prior to the meeting. To review click here
Monthly Meeting

Carroll
Created: 1/24/2023 12:00 PM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Carroll County Senate and House Delegations Meeting
Carroll County Delegation Meeting
Vote on local bills and local bond initiatives
(Removed - 1/24/2023 4:50 PM)

Harford
Created: 1/16/2023 3:21 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Harford County Delegation Meeting

Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
Created: 1/23/2023 8:50 AM
Work Session
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 142, Annapolis, MD
Immediately after the Senate and House floor sessions
Review of Disclosures and Disclaimers
Work Session

Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland
Created: 1/25/2023 3:55 PM
8:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland Meeting

Montgomery
Created: 1/24/2023 11:50 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Economic Development Committee
Meeting Video
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Economic Development Committee.

Prince George's
Created: 1/9/2023 4:13 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Law Enforcement Committee
The Law Enforcement Committee covers the following and related issues:
(Added - 1/25/2023 4:01 PM)
Alcoholic Beverages
(Added - 1/25/2023 4:01 PM)
Police
(Added - 1/25/2023 4:01 PM)
Courts
(Added - 1/25/2023 4:01 PM)
Gaming
(Added - 1/25/2023 4:01 PM)
Criminal Procedure
(Added - 1/25/2023 4:01 PM)
Public Safety
(Added - 1/25/2023 4:01 PM)
All local and bi-county bills are assigned to one of the following committees for study and review before being voted on in the full House Delegation.
(Removed - 1/25/2023 4:01 PM)
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
(Removed - 1/25/2023 4:01 PM)
The Bi-County Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
(Removed - 1/25/2023 4:01 PM)
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
(Removed - 1/25/2023 4:01 PM)

Washington
Created: 1/24/2023 1:23 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Washington County Delegation Meeting

Click to return on the top page