Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/5/2023 12:56:16 AM
Tuesday, December 5, 2023
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 11/28/2023 1:41 PM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
National Conference of State Legislatures
Maryland Judiciary
(Added - 11/29/2023 5:35 PM)
Youth Advocate Programs
Anne Arundel County Fresh START
Youth Services Bureaus
(Added - 11/29/2023 5:35 PM)
Jacob's Ladder Foundation
(Added - 11/30/2023 12:15 PM)
The Choice Program at UMBC
(Added - 11/30/2023 12:15 PM)
Roca Baltimore

Other
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On
Created: 9/18/2023 3:18 PM
5:00 PM - Maryland Judicial Center, 187 Harry S. Truman Pkwy., Annapolis, MD 21401
Those who wish to speak at the hearing should register by emailing David Soule, Executive Director of the MSCCSP at dsoule@umd.edu. Participants are requested to limit their comments to five minutes.
Registration and/or submission of written comments should be no later than December 1, 2023. Email written testimony to dsoule@umd.edu
To view the livestream of the meeting click here
The Maryland State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy (MSCCSP) invites public comment on criminal sentencing policy issues.

Created: 9/18/2023 3:45 PM
6:30 PM - Maryland Judicial Center, 187 Harry S. Truman Pkwy., Annapolis, MD 21401
Observers may view the livestream via the MSCCSP YouTube channel by clicking here
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.

Click to return on the top page