Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 1/17/2022 4:53:39 AM
Monday, January 17, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 1/3/2022 3:14 PM
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by the Attorney General and Opioid Operation Command Center on the effect of pending settlements on the Opioid Restitution Fund.
(Added - 1/13/2022 5:28 PM)
Briefing on the effect of pending settlements on the Opioid Restitution Fund
(Removed - 1/13/2022 5:28 PM)

Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 1/4/2022 4:23 PM
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 1/11/2022 1:57 PM
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on the effects of pending settlements on the Opioid Restitution Fund

Other
Montgomery
Created: 1/7/2022 4:30 PM
7:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Metro Washington Area Committee
Meeting Video
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Metro Washington Area Committee.

Click to return on the top page