Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/7/2022 11:39:21 AM
Wednesday, December 7, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 11/2/2022 1:11 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Work Session
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Commercial Vehicle Towing Workgroup

Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 7/29/2022 1:36 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream link click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 11/21/2022 3:57 PM
2:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Best Practices Subcommittee Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 832 1362 7845 Passcode: 322567 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
Meeting of the Best Practices Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports.

Click to return on the top page