Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/6/2022 11:41:37 PM
Tuesday, December 6, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On
Created: 10/12/2022 2:08 PM
5:00 PM - Maryland Judicial Center, 187 Harry S. Truman Pkwy., Annapolis, MD 21401
The Maryland State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy (MSCCSP) invites public comment on criminal sentencing policy-related issues. Those who wish to speak at the hearing should limit comments to five minutes and register and submit their written comments by December 2, 2022 to David Soule at dsoule@umd.edu
Anyone who wishes to observe may view the live stream by clicking here

Created: 10/12/2022 2:15 PM
6:30 PM - Maryland Judicial Center, 187 Harry S. Truman Pkwy., Annapolis, MD 21401
Anyone wishing to simply observe the live stream may click here
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.

Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Created: 9/29/2022 7:22 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Audit: Part 1 Maryland Department of Labor - Division of Unemployment Insurance
(Added - 12/1/2022 7:04 AM)
Audit: Part 2 Maryland Department of Labor - Division of Unemployment Insurance
(Added - 12/1/2022 7:04 AM)
Office of Legislative Audits (OLA): Fraud Investigation Unit Update and Results
(Added - 12/1/2022 7:04 AM)
OLA: Report on Follow-up Process and Repeat Audit Findings
(Added - 12/1/2022 7:04 AM)
OLA: Summary of Audit Reports and Recommended Committee Action
(Added - 12/1/2022 7:04 AM)
TBD
(Removed - 12/1/2022 7:04 AM)

Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
Created: 11/17/2022 12:43 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Review of recent legislation impacting children, youth, and families in Maryland.

Joint Committee on Pensions
Created: 11/28/2022 3:24 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Board Requested Legislation
2021 Actuarial Valuation and 2023 Contribution Rates
Discussion of Amortization Policy

New Legislators Orientation Program, Maryland General Assembly
Created: 11/2/2022 2:53 PM
8:00 AM - Senate and House Chambers, The State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
Orientation program for newly elected legislators.

Click to return on the top page