Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 3/22/2023 10:59:11 PM
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
Senate
Created: 3/9/2023 11:42 AM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Updated Bill Order
Del J. Lewis

Primary and Secondary Education – Title IX – Notice (Hear Our Voices Act)
Del Ebersole, et al

Nonpublic Schools and Child Care Providers - Corporal Punishment - Prohibition
Del Ivey

Early Childhood Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Montessori Schools and Programs
(Added - 3/16/2023 3:24 PM)
Del Boyce, et al

Public and Nonpublic Schools - Bronchodilator Availability and Use - Policies
(Added - 3/16/2023 3:24 PM)
Del Boyce, et al

Education - Public School Athletics - Basketball Schedule
(Added - 3/16/2023 3:24 PM)
Del Henson, et al

Public Institutions of Higher Education - Student Withdrawal Policy - Reimbursement of Tuition and Fees (Cameron Carden Act of 2023)
(Added - 3/16/2023 3:24 PM)
Del Rosenberg

Election Law - Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems - Notification and Termination of Contract
Del Guyton, et al

Outdoor Preschool License Pilot Program - Establishment
(Added - 3/16/2023 3:24 PM)
Dels Kaiser and Wilkins

Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits
(Added - 3/16/2023 3:24 PM)

Created: 3/22/2023 10:28 AM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Work Session
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB 526 - Natural Resources - Forest Preservation and Retention
(Added - 3/22/2023 11:47 AM)
SB 326 - Natural Resources - Forest Preservation and Retention
(Removed - 3/22/2023 11:46 AM)

Created: 3/17/2023 8:34 AM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
All bills are sponsor only, unless otherwise noted.
Del Bagnall, et al

Health Occupations - Psychologists - Licensure Qualification
(Added - 3/19/2023 8:08 PM)
Del Rosenberg, et al

Cigarette Restitution Fund - Payments for Sale and Marketing of Electronic Smoking Devices - Use
Del Kipke

Commercial Law - Ability to Repay Verification - Exemption
(Added - 3/19/2023 3:28 PM)
Del R. Lewis, et al

State Board of Physicians - Supervised Medical Graduates
(Added - 3/19/2023 8:08 PM)
Del Amprey

Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, and Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals - Extension of Dates
(Added - 3/19/2023 8:08 PM)
Baltimore City Delegation

Baltimore City - Insurance - Certificates of Guarantee for County Bond Requirements
(Added - 3/19/2023 3:28 PM)
Del Lopez, et al

Financial Institutions - Student Financing Companies - Required Registration and Reporting
(Added - 3/19/2023 3:28 PM)
Dels Phillips and Ebersole

Baltimore County - Insurance - Certificates of Guarantee for County Bond Requirements
(Added - 3/19/2023 3:28 PM)
Del Griffith

Commercial Law - Consumer Protection Act - Floral Wire Services
Full bill hearing
(Added - 3/19/2023 3:28 PM)
Del Boafo, et al

Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation - Licensed Certified Social Worker-Clinical
Full bill hearing
(Added - 3/19/2023 8:08 PM)
Del Valderrama

Workers' Compensation - Fees for Legal Services
Full bill hearing
(Added - 3/19/2023 8:08 PM)

Created: 3/21/2023 4:57 PM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
2:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sens Klausmeier and McCray

Insurance – Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund – Assessments
Sens Ellis and Rosapepe

Hospitals – Overdoses – Testing for Fentanyl
Sen Muse, et al

Pharmacies - Prescription Drugs - Accessible Labels for Blind, Visually Impaired, and Print Disabled Individuals
Sen Beidle

Anne Arundel County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Residency Requirement
Sen Benson, et al

Breast and Lung Cancer - Establishment of Screening Awareness Program and Insurance Coverage and Cost Sharing

Created: 3/16/2023 6:21 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
All bills will be Sponsor Only
Del Lehman, et al

Vehicle Laws – Horse Riding – Helmet Requirement for Minors
Del Sample-Hughes

Motor Vehicles - School Vehicle Drivers - Medical Examinations
Del Watson

Business Regulation - Charitable Organizations
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Plug–In Electric Drive Vehicles
Del Griffith, et al

Vehicle Laws - Disabled Veteran Registration Plates - Issuance
Del Foley

Abandoned Vehicles - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification
Del Williams

Child in Need of Assistance – Neglect – Cannabis Use
(Removed - 3/21/2023 10:16 AM)

House
Created: 3/14/2023 1:04 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Special Witness Guidelines
All bills are sponsor only, unless otherwise noted.
The Pres

Mandated Reports - Revisions
Sen Beidle, et al

Health Occupations - Licensed Athletic Trainers - Dry Needling Approval
Sen Kagan

Open Meetings Act - State Ethics Commission (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act of 2023)
Sen Kagan

State Finance and Procurement - Grants - Prompt Payment Requirement
(Added - 3/18/2023 11:57 AM)
Sen Kramer, et al

Maryland Holocaust Remembrance Day
(Added - 3/20/2023 2:30 PM)
Sen Sydnor, et al

Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension
(Added - 3/20/2023 2:30 PM)
Sen M. Washington

State Government - Commission on LGBTQIA+ Affairs - Alterations
Sens Hester and Bailey

Certified Local Farm and Fish Program - Establishment
Sen Lam (State Brd of Chirpractc Exminrs)

Health Occupations - State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Disciplinary Actions and Procedures
Sen Lam, et al

Local Procurements - Minority Business Enterprise Utilization Programs - Certification
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
(Added - 3/20/2023 2:30 PM)
Sen Simonaire, et al

Department of Veterans Affairs - Burial in State Veterans' Cemeteries - Spouses and Dependents
(Added - 3/20/2023 2:30 PM)
Sen Simonaire

Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program – Definitions – Therapy Horse
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
(Added - 3/20/2023 2:30 PM)
Sen McCray, et al

Transit - Commuter Bus Service - Procurement
Sens Ellis and Augustine

Massage Therapy - Discipline
Sen Ellis

Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing
(Added - 3/18/2023 11:57 AM)
Sen Ellis

State Board of Physicians – Inactive and Emeritus Status
(Added - 3/18/2023 11:57 AM)
Sens Griffith and Hester

Procurement Improvement Council - Membership and Duties
Sen Hayes

Baltimore City – West North Avenue Development Authority – Membership and Procurement
Sen Hayes

Maryland African American Museum Corporation - Board of Directors - Membership
Sen Hayes

State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Extension and Reports

Created: 3/17/2023 4:24 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Sens Waldstreicher and Muse

Automatic Expungement - Clarification
Sen Carter

Child Custody - Relocation of Child - Expedited Hearing (Assurance of Child's Safety Act)
Sens Hettleman and Jennings

Task Force on Preventing and Countering Elder Abuse
Sen Jackson

Juvenile Court – Concurrent Jurisdiction – Juvenile Offenses on Military Installations
Sen Brooks

Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearages - Workers' Compensation
Sen Lam

Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practice – Repeal
Chr JUD (Dept)

Family Law - Child Care - Criminal Background Investigations

Created: 3/7/2023 12:09 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Sen Rosapepe

More Opportunities for Career–Focused Students Act of 2023
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Economic Matters)
Sen Ellis

Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Student FAFSA Data - Reporting Requirement
Sen King, et al

Education - Libraries - Funding
This bill is Sponsor only oral testimony
Sen King, et al

Education - State Library Resource Center - Funding
This bill is Sponsor only oral testimony

Other
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
Created: 3/20/2023 2:54 PM
9:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 142, Annapolis, MD
Review of Disclosures and Disclaimers
Work Session

Prince George's
Canceled
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
County Affairs Committee
All local and bi-county bills are assigned to one of the following committees for study and review before being voted on in the full House Delegation. The local committee then votes to make a recommendation to the full delegation.
County Government
The County Affairs Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
Economic Development

Click to return on the top page