Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 3/24/2023 3:57:26 PM
Thursday, January 5, 2023
Thursday, January 5, 2023
House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: January 5, 2023 10:46 AM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
January 12, 2023 11:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Change made: January 5, 2023 10:56 AM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
January 19, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: January 5, 2023 2:43 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Other
January 12, 2023 10:30 AM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
(Previous Location: House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD)
(Previous Location: Zoom / YouTube)

Judiciary Committee
Change made: January 5, 2023 9:31 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Other
January 11, 2023 9:30 AM to January 11, 2023 11:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
- House Judiciary Committee's Opening Day Pre-Session Reception hosted by Chairman Luke H. Clippinger

Other
Southern Maryland
Change made: January 5, 2023 4:20 PM - HEARING ADDED
Southern Maryland - Other
January 27, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 5, 2023 4:22 PM - HEARING ADDED
Southern Maryland - Other
February 10, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 5, 2023 4:24 PM - HEARING ADDED
Southern Maryland - Other
February 24, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 5, 2023 4:25 PM - HEARING ADDED
Southern Maryland - Other
March 10, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 5, 2023 4:26 PM - HEARING ADDED
Southern Maryland - Other
March 24, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 5, 2023 4:27 PM - HEARING ADDED
Southern Maryland - Other
April 7, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page