Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 5/27/2023 9:10:06 PM
Friday, January 13, 2023
Friday, January 13, 2023
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 13, 2023 2:08 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 19, 2023 1:30 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0046
Sen Rosapepe

Funding for Wage Increases for Medical Provider Workers
REMOVED: 1:52 PM
SB0050
Sen Pinsky, et al

State Finance – Prohibited Appropriations – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
REMOVED: 2:08 PM

Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: January 13, 2023 11:34 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
January 24, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0004
Sen Ellis

Higher Education - The Senator Delores G. Kelley Scholarship Program - Establishment
SB0031
Sen Carter

Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Student Members and Task Force to Study Compensation and Student Members
SB0063
Sen Kramer

Public Institutions of Higher Education - Transcript Requests by Students With Unpaid Student Account Balances
SB0120
Sen Lam

Public Schools - Anaphylactic Food Allergies - Guidelines
SB0121
Sen Rosapepe

More Opportunities for Career–Focused Students Act of 2023
SB0127
Sen Ellis

Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Student FAFSA Data - Reporting Requirement

Change made: January 13, 2023 11:12 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Briefing
January 24, 2023 1:30 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Maryland 529 Briefing

Change made: January 13, 2023 10:37 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
January 25, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0010
Sen Bailey

Department of Natural Resources – Documents – Digital or Electronic Issuance
SB0029
Sen McCray

Baltimore City Soil Conservation District - Establishment - Requirements
SB0034
Sen Hester

Department of Agriculture - State Ombudsman for Value-Added Agriculture
SB0080
Sen Bailey

Natural Resources – Blue and Flathead Catfish Finfish Trotline License – Establishment
SB0091
Sen Bailey

Natural Resources – Apprentice Hunting License – Alterations
SB0102
Sen Bailey

Natural Resources - Recreational Crabbing License - Exemption
SB0124
Sen Hester

Maryland Food System Resiliency Council

Change made: January 13, 2023 10:38 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0007
Sen West

Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Board, Fees, and Penalties
SB0092
Sen Lam

Department of General Services – Energy–Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2023)

Change made: January 13, 2023 11:37 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Briefing
February 7, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services.

Finance Committee
Change made: January 13, 2023 2:34 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Briefing
January 24, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - HSCRC Briefing on the Total Cost of Care Model
1:00 PM - MHCC Briefing on Certificates of Need, Telehealth and other MHCC Activities

Change made: January 13, 2023 2:34 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Briefing
January 25, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Health Occupations 101 (A briefing from the Maryland Department of Health and various health occupations boards)

Change made: January 13, 2023 2:34 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Briefing
January 26, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - Fiscal Briefing
2:00 PM - Financial Institutions 101 (A briefing from the Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation)

Change made: January 13, 2023 12:54 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0048
Sen Lam

Disaster Service and Uniformed Services Leave Modernization Act of 2023
ADDED: 12:54 PM

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 13, 2023 1:54 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Other
January 19, 2023 12:30 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: January 13, 2023 4:45 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
January 31, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0065
Dels S. Johnson and Charkoudian

Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining
HB0074
Del Korman

Transportation – Maryland Rail Authority – Establishment (Maryland Rail Investment Act of 2023)
HB0108
Del Acevero

Human Services - Universal Basic Income for Transition-Age Youth - Establishment
HB0112
Del Bagnall, et al

State Personnel - Whistleblower Law - Procedures and Remedies (First Amendment and Public Employee Protection Act)

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: January 13, 2023 11:30 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
January 17, 2023 11:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by Maryland Environmental Service
ADDED: 11:30 AM
Briefing by Maryland Association of Counties and Maryland Municipal League
ADDED: 11:30 AM

Change made: January 13, 2023 3:20 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
January 24, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Briefing: Chaney Enterprises
REMOVED: 3:20 PM
Briefing: Landlord-Tenant Rental Relief Funding Issues and COVID-19 Supportive Assistance

Change made: January 13, 2023 12:36 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
January 25, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: January 13, 2023 10:59 AM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 31, 2023 2:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0060
Del Stewart

Housing Innovation Pilot Program and Housing Innovation Fund - Establishment (Housing Innovation Pilot Program Act of 2023)
HB0079
Del Stewart

Housing and Community Development - Whole-Home Repairs Act of 2023
HB0092
Del Holmes

Ground Leases - Collection of Rent, Interest, Fees, and Other Expenses - Registration Requirements
HB0093
Del Holmes

Residential Ground Leases - Redemption and Extinguishment - Requirements
HB0102
Del Stein

Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections
HB0118
Del Holmes

Ground Leases – Notices and Billing – Forms and Requirements

Other
Anne Arundel
Change made: January 13, 2023 12:05 PM - HEARING ADDED
Anne Arundel - Other
January 20, 2023 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Anne Arundel County House Delegation Meeting

Change made: January 13, 2023 12:06 PM - HEARING ADDED
Anne Arundel - Other
January 27, 2023 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Anne Arundel County House Delegation Meeting

Harford
Change made: January 13, 2023 7:24 AM - HEARING ADDED
Harford - Other
January 19, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Harford County Delegation Meeting

Southern Maryland
Change made: January 13, 2023 2:28 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Southern Maryland - Other
January 13, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page