Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 6/23/2021 3:06:33 PM
Sunday, February 7, 2021
Sunday, February 7, 2021
House
Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: February 7, 2021 10:29 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 23, 2021 1:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 23, 2021 1:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
HB0501
Mont Co Deleg and PG Co Deleg

Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Board of Ethics – Financial Disclosure Statements – Late Fees MC/PG 102–21
HB0769
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Public Body MC 07–21
HB1023
Del Holmes

Real Property – Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations – Virtual Meetings
HB1058
Del Stewart

Public Ethics - Disclosures, Training, and Use of Confidential Information (Integrity in High Office Act)
HB1073
Del Bridges

Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program
HB1090
Del Stewart

Department of Housing and Community Development – Partnership Rental Housing Program – Alterations (Mixed–Income Housing Act of 2021)
HB1095
Del Bridges

Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification

Change made: February 7, 2021 12:53 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 24, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0857
Del Lehman

Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Chain of Custody and Reuse
HB0866
Del Smith

Environment - Business Recycling Reporting Requirements
HB0991
Del Gilchrist

Natural Resources – Forest Mitigation Banks – Qualified Preservation
HB0992
Del Gilchrist

Natural Resources - Maryland Environmental Trust - Appointment of Trustees
HB0993
Chr ENT (Dept)

Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
HB1025
Del Terrasa

Pesticides – Carbofuran – Collection, Disposal, and Prohibition on Possession or Storage
HB1069
Del Stewart

Water Supply - Private Well Safety Program
HB1094
Del Ruth

Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
HB1103
Del Wivell

Task Force to Study Recycling and the Processing of Solid Waste
HB1133
Del Bridges

Tree Planting – Urban Trees Program and Commission for the Innovation and Advancement of Carbon Markets and Sustainable Tree Plantings

Change made: February 7, 2021 1:34 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 25, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB1074
Del R. Watson

Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Inspection, Performance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran's Law)
HB1082
Del Lopez

Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters
HB1098
Del M. Fisher

Elected Officials – State–Owned Electric Vehicle Charging Stations – Reimbursement
HB1114
Del Arentz

Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law – Yard Waste – Disposal on Highways
HB1117
Del Arentz

Kent Narrows Bridge – State Highway Right–of–Way – Fishing Prohibition

Change made: February 7, 2021 1:36 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 26, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB1134
Del Carey

Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
HB1135
Del Chisholm

Environment – State Wetlands – Piers and Other Improvements

Click to return on the top page