Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Update Report

As of: 5/9/2025 2:06:49 AM
Friday, March 7, 2025
Friday, March 7, 2025
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: March 7, 2025 11:02 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 12, 2025 3:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB1000
Sen Hettleman

Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Request for Relocation
ADDED: 11:02 AM

House
Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: March 7, 2025 5:43 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 13, 2025 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1489
Del Martinez, et al

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage for the Treatment of Obesity
ADDED: 5:43 PM
HB1502
Del Wells (BCA)

Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Pilot Program - Revisions
ADDED: 5:43 PM
HB1510
Del Pippy, et al

Medical Records - Notice of Destruction - Method
ADDED: 5:43 PM
HB1515
Del Cullison

Certificate of Need - Intermediate Health Care Facilities - Exemptions
ADDED: 5:43 PM
HB1538
Del Woods

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Maternal Health Monitoring Pilot Program
ADDED: 5:43 PM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: March 7, 2025 12:54 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
March 11, 2025 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB1378
Del Wilson

Child Sexual Abuse Claims Against the State - Time Limitation
REMOVED: 12:54 PM

Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee
Change made: March 7, 2025 3:37 PM - HEARING ADDED
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Work Session
March 10, 2025 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee
Change made: March 7, 2025 6:33 PM - HEARING ADDED
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 11, 2025 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HBs 290, 386, 737, 871, 1142, 1244, 1053, 1066, 1083, 1146, 1289, and 1131

Other
No. 11 - Baltimore City
Change made: March 7, 2025 4:27 PM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
March 10, 2025 4:15 PM
Virtual Meeting

Click to return on the top page