Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 6/19/2024 7:13:35 PM
Monday, April 1, 2024
Monday, April 1, 2024
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: April 1, 2024 6:39 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
April 2, 2024 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: April 1, 2024 1:51 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
April 1, 2024 4:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Change made: April 1, 2024 5:27 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
April 2, 2024 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB1183
Sen Carter (BCA)

Natural Resources - Establishment of Gwynns Falls State Park
ADDED: 5:27 PM

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: April 1, 2024 8:56 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
April 2, 2024 2:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: April 1, 2024 5:54 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
April 2, 2024 11:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
SB0441
Sen Beidle

Janet L. Hoffman Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Nancy Grasmick Public School Professional Award - School Nurses
SB0972
Sen Guzzone

Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
SB1080
Sen McCray, et al

State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates
SB0376
Sen King, et al

Higher Education – MPowering Joint Steering Council – Funding
ADDED: 5:54 PM

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: April 1, 2024 6:32 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
April 4, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Environment Subcommittee
Change made: April 1, 2024 4:51 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment Subcommittee - Work Session
April 3, 2024 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: April 1, 2024 3:30 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
April 3, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SBs 236, 237, 238, 239, 240, 241, 242, 243, 257, and 718
HB 354

Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee
Change made: April 1, 2024 11:58 AM - HEARING ADDED
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Work Session
April 2, 2024 12:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
Change made: April 1, 2024 11:58 AM - HEARING ADDED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
April 2, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee
Change made: April 1, 2024 6:31 PM - HEARING ADDED
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
April 4, 2024 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee
Change made: April 1, 2024 3:17 PM - HEARING ADDED
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
April 2, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HBs 986 and 1472
SBs 117, 245, 594, and 991
REMOVED: 3:17 PM
SBs 117, 245, 578, 594, and 991
ADDED: 3:17 PM

Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: April 1, 2024 6:44 PM - HEARING ADDED
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee - Bill Hearing
April 2, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
SB0524
Sen M. Washington

General Assembly - Committee Chairs and Vice Chairs - Gender-Neutral Language
SB1106
The Pres (DLS)

Annual Corrective Bill

Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: April 1, 2024 8:09 AM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
April 18, 2024 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Board Meeting

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Change made: April 1, 2024 12:58 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Other
April 11, 2024 10:00 AM
Atman-Glazer Building, Room 164 A&B, 45 Calvert St. , Annapolis, MD 21401
Meeting of the Maryland Consortium of Coordinated Community Supports.

Click to return on the top page