Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 8/13/2022 5:15:22 AM
Wednesday, May 4, 2022
Wednesday, May 4, 2022
Other
Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee
Change made: May 4, 2022 9:04 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee - Other
May 12, 2022 1:00 PM
Harry Hughes Conference Center, MDOT Headquarters, 7201 Corporate Center Drive, Hanover, MD
Meeting of the Health Equity Resource Community Advisory Committee (Joint with CHRC).

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Change made: May 4, 2022 8:58 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
May 12, 2022 10:00 AM
Harry Hughes Conference Center, MDOT Headquarters, 7201 Corporate Center Drive, Hanover, MD
Regular Meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission

Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland, Commission to Advance
Change made: May 4, 2022 9:16 AM - HEARING ADDED
Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland, Commission to Advance - Other
May 12, 2022 9:30 AM to May 12, 2022 12:30 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Change made: May 4, 2022 8:51 AM - HEARING UPDATED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
May 11, 2022 3:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: May 12, 2022 9:00 AM)
Virtual Meeting
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business and approval of 100% of the Capital Improvement Program.

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Change made: May 4, 2022 2:38 PM - HEARING ADDED
Sports Wagering Application Review Commission - Other
May 18, 2022 9:00 AM
Virtual Meeting

Click to return on the top page