Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 8/10/2022 12:48:49 AM
Thursday, May 12, 2022
Thursday, May 12, 2022
Other
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On
Change made: May 12, 2022 7:44 AM - HEARING ADDED
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On - Other
July 12, 2022 5:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.

Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board
Change made: May 12, 2022 7:39 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board - Other
September 14, 2022 12:00 PM to September 14, 2022 2:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: June 23, 2022 9:00 AM to 11:00 AM)
1746 World Trade Center, 401 East Pratt St. Baltimore, MD
The Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board will meet to discuss issues pertaining to the life sciences and medical technology communities.

Click to return on the top page