Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 10/25/2021 6:49:19 AM
Monday, July 12, 2021
Monday, July 12, 2021
Other
Assessment and Funding of School Facilities, Workgroup on the
Change made: July 12, 2021 11:02 AM - HEARING ADDED
Assessment and Funding of School Facilities, Workgroup on the - Other
July 28, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority
Change made: July 12, 2021 2:02 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority - Other
August 13, 2021 9:00 AM
Conference Call
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority Meeting.

Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Change made: July 12, 2021 11:47 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee - Other
July 22, 2021 1:00 PM to July 22, 2021 3:00 PM
Webex-Teleconference
TBD

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Change made: July 12, 2021 1:52 PM - HEARING ADDED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
August 12, 2021 9:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Public video conference to discuss regular normal IAC business.

Click to return on the top page