Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 10/17/2021 6:01:38 PM
Thursday, July 29, 2021
Thursday, July 29, 2021
Other
Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee
Change made: July 29, 2021 4:04 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee - Other
August 11, 2021 1:00 PM
Conference Room Side A, 100 Community Place, Crownsville, MD
Initial meeting of the Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee (joint with CHRC Commissioners).

Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Change made: July 29, 2021 4:26 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee - Other
August 25, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Office of Legislative Audits: Summary Reports Issued and Recommended Committee Action
Audit: Department of Human Services-Social Services Administration (June 2021)
Audit: Judiciary (April 2021)

Change made: July 29, 2021 4:27 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee - Other
November 9, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: July 29, 2021 4:28 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee - Other
December 1, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Change made: July 29, 2021 3:53 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
August 11, 2021 10:30 AM
Conference Room Side A, 100 Community Place, Crownsville, MD
Regular meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission

Click to return on the top page