Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 10/25/2021 8:02:31 AM
Monday, August 9, 2021
Monday, August 9, 2021
Other
Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards, Task Force to Study
Change made: August 9, 2021 3:25 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards, Task Force to Study - Other
August 12, 2021 10:30 AM
Zoom Meeting
(Previous Location: Google Meet Video Conference)
First Meeting

Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On
Change made: August 9, 2021 5:38 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On - Other
September 14, 2021 5:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
(Previous Location: Maryland Judicial Center, 187 Harry S. Truman Pkwy., Annapolis, MD 21401)
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.

Maryland Economic Development Commission
Change made: August 9, 2021 4:19 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Economic Development Commission - Other
September 13, 2021 11:30 AM
The Music Center Lobby at Strathmore, 5301 Tuckerman Lane, N. Bethesda, MD
Updates from the Department of Commerce.

Click to return on the top page