Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 10/19/2021 8:49:24 AM
Thursday, August 12, 2021
Thursday, August 12, 2021
House
Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: August 12, 2021 1:18 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
August 24, 2021 12:00 PM to August 24, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Other
Accountability and Implementation Board Nominating Committee
Change made: August 12, 2021 11:08 AM - HEARING ADDED
Accountability and Implementation Board Nominating Committee - Work Session
August 25, 2021 1:00 PM to August 25, 2021 4:00 PM
Closed Meeting
Work Session

Capital Debt Affordability Committee
Change made: August 12, 2021 11:15 AM - HEARING ADDED
Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Other
October 4, 2021 2:00 PM
Assembly Room, 1st Floor, Louis L. Goldstein Treasury Bldg., 80 Calvert St., Annapolis, MD
Legislative review, revenue estimates, and review of capital programs.

Change made: August 12, 2021 11:17 AM - HEARING ADDED
Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Other
October 14, 2021 1:00 PM
Assembly Room, 1st Floor, Louis L. Goldstein Treasury Bldg., 80 Calvert St., Annapolis, MD
Review of tax supported debt and the size and condition of debt of higher Education institutions.

Change made: August 12, 2021 11:18 AM - HEARING ADDED
Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Other
October 18, 2021 1:00 PM
Assembly Room, 1st Floor, Louis L. Goldstein Treasury Bldg., 80 Calvert St., Annapolis, MD
Recommendation of general obligation bond authorizations.

Click to return on the top page