Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 10/17/2021 7:22:54 PM
Thursday, August 19, 2021
Thursday, August 19, 2021
House
Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: August 19, 2021 2:08 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
September 15, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
- Suicide Rates in Maryland
- Follow-up on HB1121 of 2020 (Maryland Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Registry and Referral System)

Other
Accountability and Implementation Board Nominating Committee
Change made: August 19, 2021 11:44 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Accountability and Implementation Board Nominating Committee - Work Session
August 25, 2021 12:00 PM to August 25, 2021 4:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: August 25, 2021 1:00 PM to 4:00 PM)
Closed Meeting
Work Session

Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee
Change made: August 19, 2021 2:27 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee - Other
August 24, 2021 8:00 AM
Conference Room Side A, 100 Community Place, Crownsville, MD
Meeting of the Data & Program Evaluation Subcommittee of the Health Equity Resource Commission Advisory Committee.

Change made: August 19, 2021 2:39 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee - Other
August 26, 2021 9:00 AM
Conference Room Side B, 100 Community Place, Crownsville, MD
Meeting of the Pathways Calls for Proposals/Design Subcommittee of the Health Equity Resource Communities Advisory Committee.

House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup
Change made: August 19, 2021 10:32 AM - HEARING ADDED
House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup - Other
September 8, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Virtual Organizational Meeting
Briefing on Maryland and National Historical Background regarding Cannabis Legislation.

Click to return on the top page