Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 12/3/2021 3:04:24 AM
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
House
Early Childhood Subcommittee
Change made: October 13, 2021 3:56 PM - HEARING ADDED
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Other
October 14, 2021 10:00 AM
Site Visit

Change made: October 13, 2021 3:58 PM - HEARING ADDED
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Other
October 15, 2021 10:00 AM
Site Visit

Economic Matters Committee
Change made: October 13, 2021 3:22 PM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Other
October 21, 2021 9:00 AM
Site Visit
Site Visit for Full Committee

Other
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Change made: October 13, 2021 10:42 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee - Other
November 9, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Follow-up hearing on fiscal compliance audit of the Department of Human Services-Social Services Administration (June 2021).
ADDED: 10:42 AM
Presentation from the Department of Budget and Management Audit Compliance Unit.
ADDED: 10:42 AM

Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority
Change made: October 13, 2021 11:06 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority - Other
October 19, 2021 9:00 AM
TEDCO, 7021 Columbia Gateway Dr., #200, Columbia, MD
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority Meeting

Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Change made: October 13, 2021 9:27 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee - Other
October 28, 2021 1:00 PM to October 28, 2021 3:00 PM
Webex-Teleconference
TBD

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Change made: October 13, 2021 7:54 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Sports Wagering Application Review Commission - Other
October 14, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page