Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/26/2022 11:35:03 AM
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: January 26, 2022 11:29 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0154
Sen Eckardt

Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
ADDED: 11:29 AM

Finance Committee
Change made: January 26, 2022 10:48 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
January 27, 2022 4:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0170
Chr FIN (Dept)

Title Insurance – Insurers and Insurance Producers – Requirements
ADDED: 10:48 AM
SB0175
Chr FIN (Dept)

Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
ADDED: 10:48 AM
SB0180
Chr FIN (Dept)

Insurance - Conformity With Federal Law - The No Surprises Act and Other Provisions of the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021
ADDED: 10:48 AM
SB0185
Chr FIN (Dept)

Maryland Insurance Administration - Virtual Hearings
ADDED: 10:48 AM
SB0188
Chr FIN (Dept)

Insurance - Managing General Agents - Review Requirements
ADDED: 10:48 AM

House
Judiciary Committee
Change made: January 26, 2022 10:58 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
January 27, 2022 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Fiscal Briefing from the Department of Legislative Services

Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee
Change made: January 26, 2022 9:29 AM - HEARING ADDED
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Work Session
January 27, 2022 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 26, 2022 11:18 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0315
Del Novotny

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
HB0317
Del Novotny

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
HB0366
Del Lierman

Office of the Comptroller - Legal Division and Private Letter Ruling Procedures
HB0386
Del D. Jones, et al

Small, Minority, and Women–Owned Businesses Account – Local State of Emergency
HB0403
Del Korman

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses
HB0405
Del Lehman, et al

Income Tax – Mechanical Insulation Installation Tax Credit
HB0432
Del Wells

Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Alterations
HB0457
Del Lehman, et al

Corporate Income Tax - Throwback Rule and Combined Reporting

Other
No. 9 - Anne Arundel County
Change made: January 26, 2022 11:30 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 9 - Anne Arundel County - Other
January 28, 2022 8:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Bi-weekly meeting of the Anne Arundel County Senate Delegation

Click to return on the top page