Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/17/2022 11:27:46 AM
Monday, January 17, 2022
Monday, January 17, 2022
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: January 17, 2022 11:03 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 1, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0131
Sen Kelley

Public Service Commission – Rate Suspension Proceedings
SB0142
Sen Beidle

State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
SB0256
Sen Beidle

Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund
SB0257
Sen Beidle

Public Service Commission – Reporting Requirements

Change made: January 17, 2022 11:09 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0060
Sen Feldman

Financial Institutions – Abandoned Property – Notice and Records
REMOVED: 11:09 AM

House
Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 17, 2022 10:31 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
January 27, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on Maryland Department of Health’s Behavioral Health Administrative Service Organization (Optum) Issues

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 17, 2022 9:47 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
January 27, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0139
Del Luedtke

State Personnel – Professional Service – Juvenile Services Education Teachers and Correction Education Teachers
HB0150
Dels Charkoudian and Solomon

Public Schools - Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste
HB0154
Del Palakovich Carr

Public Schools - Anaphylactic Food Allergies - Guidelines and Requirements
HB0192
Del Ebersole

Baltimore County Board of Education – Student Member – Voting
HB0194
Del Shetty

Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Sexting
HB0196
Del Thiam

Public Schools and County Boards of Education - Publication of School Library Catalogs
HB0200
Del Amprey

Education - Public Middle and High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement

Click to return on the top page