Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 9/28/2023 10:59:11 PM
Thursday, September 28, 2023
Thursday, September 28, 2023
Other
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Change made: September 28, 2023 11:15 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee - Other
November 14, 2023 9:00 AM
(Previous Date/Time: November 14, 2023 10:00 AM)
Location-TBD
Office of Legislative Audits; TBD

Transportation Revenue and Infrastructure Needs, Maryland Commission on
Change made: September 28, 2023 10:33 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Transportation Revenue and Infrastructure Needs, Maryland Commission on - Other
October 2, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Change made: September 28, 2023 2:51 PM - HEARING ADDED
Transportation Revenue and Infrastructure Needs, Maryland Commission on - Other
October 18, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Click to return on the top page