Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 7/5/2022 3:15:30 PM
Tuesday, July 5, 2022
Tuesday, July 5, 2022
Other
Board of Public Works
Change made: July 5, 2022 1:49 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Board of Public Works - Other
July 6, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
(Previous Location: Virtual/In Person Meeting)
General Meeting

Maryland Economic Development Commission
Change made: July 5, 2022 10:07 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Economic Development Commission - Other
August 16, 2022 12:00 PM
Visit Baltimore, 10th Floor, 400 E. Pratt St., Baltimore, MD
Updates from the Department of Commerce, Office of Tourism and Film and Visit Baltimore.

Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Change made: July 5, 2022 8:16 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee - Other
July 28, 2022 1:00 PM to July 28, 2022 3:00 PM
Webex-Teleconference
TBD

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Change made: July 5, 2022 10:14 AM - HEARING ADDED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
July 14, 2022 9:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business.

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Change made: July 5, 2022 10:25 AM - HEARING ADDED
Sports Wagering Application Review Commission - Other
July 20, 2022 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page