Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/28/2024 1:19:06 PM
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: February 28, 2024 9:31 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 28, 2024 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0903
Sen Muse

Prince George’s County – Mobile Sports Wagering Proceeds – Local Impact Grant
REMOVED: 9:31 AM

Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: February 28, 2024 12:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Appear
March 4, 2024 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

Change made: February 28, 2024 12:01 PM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appear
March 4, 2024 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: February 28, 2024 12:32 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Appropriations Committee - Budget Hearing
February 28, 2024 4:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 28, 2024 12:45 PM)
(Previous Date/Time: February 28, 2024 12:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Governor's Office of Children

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 28, 2024 12:27 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 29, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1423
Dels S. Johnson and A. Johnson

Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Step Therapy, Fail-First Protocols, and Prior Authorization - Prescription Drugs to Treat Serious Mental Illness
REMOVED: 12:27 PM

Oversight Committee on Personnel
Change made: February 28, 2024 12:15 PM - HEARING ADDED
Oversight Committee on Personnel - Voting Session
February 29, 2024 9:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Other
Maryland Economic Development Commission
Change made: February 28, 2024 10:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Economic Development Commission - Other
March 20, 2024 3:00 PM
Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
Updates from the Department of Commerce; Preliminary discussion on the development of a Strategic Plan.

Montgomery
Change made: February 28, 2024 10:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
March 1, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation.

Change made: February 28, 2024 10:44 AM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
March 1, 2024 9:30 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Economic Development Committee.

Click to return on the top page