Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 9/27/2021 8:54:45 PM
Monday, September 27, 2021
Monday, September 27, 2021
Other
House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup
Change made: September 27, 2021 1:37 PM - HEARING ADDED
House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup - Other
October 13, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Presentation and Discussion on Cannabis and Health Determinants.

Change made: September 27, 2021 1:39 PM - HEARING ADDED
House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup - Other
October 27, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Presentation and Discussion on Cannabis and Criminal Justice Impacts.

Change made: September 27, 2021 1:40 PM - HEARING ADDED
House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup - Other
November 9, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Presentation and Discussion on Cannabis and Business Implementation and Regulation.

Change made: September 27, 2021 1:42 PM - HEARING ADDED
House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup - Other
December 1, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Presentation and Discussion on Cannabis and Taxation.

Click to return on the top page